Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009330

EP1009330 - IMPLANTABLE HEARING ASSISTANCE DEVICE WITH REMOTE ELECTRONICS UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2003Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.06.2003  [2003/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Croix Medical, Inc.
Suite 418, 5155 East River Road
Minneapolis, MN 55421 / US
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / KENNEDY, Joel, A.
3465 Siems Court
Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Kinsler, Maureen Catherine
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London
WC1R 4PJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Kinsler, Maureen Catherine
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date97948479.724.11.1997
[2000/25]
WO1997US21432
Priority number, dateUS1996075518125.11.1996         Original published format: US 755181
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823230
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009330
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search reportUS04.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/18, A61N1/36
[2000/50]
Former International [2000/25]A61F2/18
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/25]
TitleGerman:MIT EINER FERNBEDIENBAREN ELEKTRONIKEINHEIT AUSGESTATTETE IMPLANTIERBARE HÖRHILFEVORRICHTUNG[2000/25]
English:IMPLANTABLE HEARING ASSISTANCE DEVICE WITH REMOTE ELECTRONICS UNIT[2000/25]
French:PROTHESE AUDITIVE IMPLANTABLE COMPRENANT UNE UNITE ELECTRONIQUE ELOIGNEE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase17.06.1999National basic fee paid 
17.06.1999Search fee paid 
17.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
17.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/25]
04.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.04.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]US5282858  (BISCH MICHAEL E [US], et al);
 [Y]US5571148  (LOEB GERALD E [CA], et al);
 [YP]US5603726  (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al)
by applicantUS4729366