Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0946791

EP0946791 - ELECTROCHEMICAL GASEOUS DIFFUSION HALF CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[1999/40]
Inventor(s)01 / GESTERMANN, Fritz
Berliner Strasse 83
D-51377 Leverkusen / DE
02 / PINTER, Hans-Dieter
Forstring 20
D-42929 Wermelskirchen / DE
03 / CAMPHAUSEN, Jens
Alfred-Stock-Strasse 6
D-51373 Leverkusen / DE
[1999/40]
Application number, filing date97948854.131.10.1997
[1999/40]
WO1997EP06030
Priority number, dateDE199614695013.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19646950
[1999/40]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9821384
Date:22.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0946791
Date:06.10.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998
[1999/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0946791
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:C25B9/00, H01M4/86
[1999/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1999/40]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROCHEMISCHE GASDIFFUSIONSHALBZELLE[1999/40]
English:ELECTROCHEMICAL GASEOUS DIFFUSION HALF CELL[1999/40]
French:DEMI-CELLULE ELECTROCHIMIQUE A DIFFUSION GAZEUSE[1999/40]
Entry into regional phase14.06.1999National basic fee paid 
14.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/40]
14.08.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.12.2000Fee for grant paid
27.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0104137  (ELTECH SYST LTD [BM]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 25 * * figure 1 *;
 [PA]DE19622744  (BAYER AG [DE]) [PA] 1-4,7 * siehe das ganze Dokument *