Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968700

EP0968700 - MATERIAL INTENDED TO REMINERALISE ORGANOMINERAL TISSUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.11.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 02.01.2013  [2013/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sociedad Limitada Para El Desarrollo Cientifico Aplicado
Passeig de Gracia, 77
08008 Barcelona / ES
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / VALIENTE MALMAGRO, Manuel
Paseo Apeadero, 87
E-08190 Sant Cugat del Vallès / ES
02 / MURAVIEV, Dimitri
Calle Pablo Picasso, 21
E-08291 Ripollet / ES
03 / ZVONNIKOVA, Ljudmila
Flotskaya Street, N 6/21
Moscow, 125565 / RU
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
[N/P]
Former [2009/29]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
Oficina Ponti C. Consell de Cent 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Former [2000/01]Ponti Sales, Adelaida , et al
C. Consell de Cent, 322
08007 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date97948914.330.12.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997ES00316
Priority number, dateES1997000001607.01.1997         Original published format: ES 9700016
[2000/01]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9830191
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968700
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968700
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search reportES16.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61K6/00, A61K6/08, A61K6/033, A61K7/16, A61L27/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
Extension statesAL29.07.1999
LT29.07.1999
LV29.07.1999
MK29.07.1999
RO29.07.1999
SI29.07.1999
TitleGerman:MATERIAL ZUM REMINERALISIEREN VON ORGANOMINERALGEWEBEN[2000/01]
English:MATERIAL INTENDED TO REMINERALISE ORGANOMINERAL TISSUES[2000/01]
French:MATERIAU REMINERALISANT DE TISSUS ORGANOMINERAUX[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase29.07.1999Translation filed 
29.07.1999National basic fee paid 
29.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
10.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2003Fee for grant paid
25.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
06.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
03.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
25.08.1999FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999GR   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999IE   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999IT   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999LU   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999MC   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999NL   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999PT   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
25.08.1999SE   M01   Fee paid on   01.09.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
IE30.12.2003
LU30.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
[2013/01]
Former [2005/23]AT28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
IE30.12.2003
LU30.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2005/03]AT28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
IE30.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2005/02]AT28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
MC31.12.2003
Former [2004/23]AT28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
DK28.08.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
Former [2004/05]AT28.05.2003
FI28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
Former [2004/03]AT28.05.2003
GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
Former [2004/02]GR28.08.2003
SE28.08.2003
Former [2003/50]SE28.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]SU825074  ;
 [XD]US3978206  (NAUMANN GUNTHER [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,12,13,15 * column 1, line 39 - column 2, line 28 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 10 *;
 [X]RU1826976  ;
 [X]FR2719996  (BALIS JEAN FRANCOIS [FR], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, line 9 - line 21 *;
 [A]US4988358  (EPPLEY BARRY L [US], et al) [A] 14,15 * column 4, line 13 - line 59 * * claim - *;
 [A]US4135935  (PFEIL EMANUEL, et al) [A] 14 * column 6, line 6 - line 31 *
 [X]  - 1, vol. 82, no. 06, Database accession no. 1982-11319E, XP002061548 [X] 1,2,4-7,13 * abstract *
 [X]  - 1, vol. 95, no. 01, Database accession no. 95-004794, XP002061549 [X] 1-3 * abstract *
 [A]  - STREAT M., ION EXCHANGE FOR INDUSTRY, CHICHESTER, GB, ELLIS HORWOOD., XP002061547 [A] 15 * page 653, paragraph 2 *
Examination   - DANIEL C. HARRIS, Analisis quimico cuantitativo, MEXICO, GRUPO EDITORIAL IBEROAMERICA, (1992),
    - (English translation) L.B.Zvonnikova, "Determination of the elemental composition of monkey teeth dentin by the method of microsounding during filling of a deep cavity with different materials", Department of Introductory courses in Therapeutic Stomatology.,
    - A concise Dictionary of Chemistry, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS,