Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0973397 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0973397



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 315
26.03.2004 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
10.04.2003 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
19.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
19.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 4
19.03.2003 Translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.03.2003 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 11
05.12.2002 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.12.2002 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
05.12.2002 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
29.10.2002 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
08.10.2002 Request for change of name Search / examination 12
03.07.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Annex Search / examination 2
03.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
03.07.2002 Claims Search / examination 4
03.07.2002 Description Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Description Search / examination 1
03.07.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.06.2002 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 10
28.02.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
24.02.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
24.02.2000 Request for change of name Search / examination 7
15.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.06.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.06.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.06.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
10.06.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 50
28.05.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
28.05.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 40
29.05.1998 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.05.1998 Annex Search / examination 5
29.05.1998 Claims Search / examination 4
29.05.1998 Description Search / examination 25
29.05.1998 Drawings Search / examination 9
29.05.1998 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
02.12.1997 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
02.12.1997 Claims International Searching Authority 4
02.12.1997 Description International Searching Authority 25
02.12.1997 Drawings International Searching Authority 9