Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0973397


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.03.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  12.05.2004  [2004/20]
04.04.2003 (Expected) grant published on  21.05.2003  [2003/21]
27.03.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
20.12.2002 Renewal fee
27.11.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.10.2002 Change - applicant published on  11.12.2002  [2002/50]
05.07.2002 Examination report or reply
02.03.2002 First examination report
25.02.2002 Examination report or reply
21.12.2001 Renewal fee
16.01.2001 Renewal fee
17.03.2000 Change - applicant published on  03.05.2000 [2000/18]
19.01.2000 Renewal fee
11.12.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
11.12.1999 Request for examination filed published on  26.01.2000 [2000/04]
09.12.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
03.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
29.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
23.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.06.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.1998 PCT data prior to European publication