Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0973397
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO9927788Global Dossier 10.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP4187271BGlobal Dossier 26.11.2008B2
JP2001508409 26.06.2001A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0973397Global Dossier 21.05.2003B1
EP0973397 26.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AP991 02.08.2001A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AT240645T 15.06.2003T
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU740846B 15.11.2001B2
AU9604898 16.06.1999A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BG63904B 30.06.2003B1
BG102506 30.12.1999A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9712240 31.08.1999A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2239795 05.02.2008C
CA2239795 02.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2582701 29.03.2011C
CA2582701 02.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
CA2239795 02.12.1997
CA2582701 02.12.1997
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2725194 02.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
CA2582701 02.12.1997
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN1120663C 10.09.2003C
CN1245396 23.02.2000A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CZ294331 15.12.2004B6
CZ189398 13.10.1999A3
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69722259D 26.06.2003D1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69722259T 11.03.2004T2
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK0973397T 15.09.2003T3
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2194226T 16.11.2003T3
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HU224869 28.03.2006B1
HU9904198 28.08.2000A3
HU9904198 28.05.2000A2
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL125281 25.07.2004A
IL125281D 12.03.1999D0
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100473471B 16.05.2005B1
KR20000064517 06.11.2000A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
MXPA98004571 24.08.2004A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ330601 22.12.2000A
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL189046B 30.06.2005B1
PL334555 13.03.2000A1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL189712B 30.09.2005B1
Priority number Date
PL33455597 02.12.1997
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PL189858B 30.09.2005B1
Priority number Date
PL33455597 02.12.1997
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
PT973397E 30.09.2003E
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RO118108 28.02.2003B1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
RU2206993 27.06.2003C2
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
SK283358B 03.06.2003B6
SK83898 11.02.1999A3
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
TR199801200T 21.03.2002T1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
UA61064 29.12.1999C2
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6384067 07.05.2002B2
US2002019428 14.02.2002A1
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6762173 13.07.2004B2
US2002132841 19.09.2002A1
Priority number Date
US7798899 14.09.1999
US9907602 13.03.2002
FR9702170 02.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA9711153 25.08.1999B
Priority number Date
FR9702170 02.12.1997