Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973397

EP0973397 - NOVEL FUNGICIDE COMPOSITION CONTAINING A 2-IMIDAZOLINE-5-ONE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 12.05.2004  [2004/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayer CropScience S.A.
55, avenue René Cassin
69009 Lyon / FR
[2003/21]
Former [2002/50]For all designated states
Bayer CropScience S.A.
55, avenue René-Cassin
69009 Lyon / FR
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
AVENTIS CROPSCIENCE S.A.
55, avenue René Cassin
69009 Lyon / FR
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
RHONE-POULENC AGROCHIMIE
14-20, rue Pierre Baizet
69009 Lyon / FR
Inventor(s)01 / CHAZALET, Maurice
Le Mont Lucenay
F-69480 Anse / FR
02 / LATORSE, Marie-Pascale
Lieu-dit "Le Jannt"
F-69210 Sourcieux les Mines / FR
03 / MERCER, Richard
14, rue du Domaine
F-69130 Ecully / FR
[2000/04]
Application number, filing date97948972.102.12.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997FR02170
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927788
Date:10.06.1999
Language:FR
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973397
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973397
Date:21.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/50, // (A01N43/50, 47:12, 43:54, 43:50, 43:30), A01N37:40
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:NEUE FUNGIZIDE MISCHUNG, DIE EIN 2-IMIDAZOLIN-5-ONE ENTHÄLT[2000/04]
English:NOVEL FUNGICIDE COMPOSITION CONTAINING A 2-IMIDAZOLINE-5-ONE[2000/04]
French:NOUVELLE COMPOSITION FONGICIDE COMPRENANT UNE 2-IMIDAZOLINE-5-ONE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase29.05.1998National basic fee paid 
29.05.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.1998Examination requested  [2000/04]
28.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.03.2003Fee for grant paid
18.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO9603044  (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR], et al) [DA] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [DA]EP0551048  (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) [DA] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [E]FR2751845  (RHONE POULENC AGROCHIMIE [FR]) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *