Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0949999

EP0949999 - A VEHICLE ROLL STABILISING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2004
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.08.2009Change - representativepublished on 30.09.2009  [2009/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Land Rover Group Limited
Banbury Road Lighthorne
Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]For all designated states
Land Rover Group Limited
Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
Rover Group Limited
International Headquarters, Warwick Technology Park
Warwick CV34 6RG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / CLARE, David Andrew
15 Wayfield Close
Shirley, Solihull B90 3HH / GB
02 / GREEN, Phillip James
10 Nuneaton Lane, Higham on the Hill
Nuneaton, Warwickshire CV13 6AD / GB
03 / BURDOCK, William
106 East View Road
Sutton Coldfield, West Midlands B72 1JA / GB
04 / PASK, Mark
237 Worcester Road
Bromsgrove, Worcestershire B61 7JA / GB
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover Patent Department (53G16/4) Banbury Road Lightthorne
Warwickshire CV35 0RG / GB
[2009/40]
Former [2003/32]Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover, Patent Department 53G 16/4, Banbury Road, Lighthorne
Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Former [2001/21]Farrow, Robert Michael , et al
Land Rover, Gaydon Engineering Centre, 53/G/9/1, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 ORG / GB
Former [1999/42]Wilson, Alan Stuart , et al
Rover Group Limited, Patent Department, Gaydon Test Centre, Banbury Road
Lighthorne, Warwick CV35 0RG / GB
Application number, filing date97949001.811.12.1997
[1999/42]
WO1997GB03314
Priority number, dateGB1996002604514.12.1996         Original published format: GB 9626045
[1999/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826948
Date:25.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0949999
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[1999/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0949999
Date:18.06.2003
Language:EN
[2003/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60G17/015, B60G21/055, B60G21/10
[1999/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   SE [1999/42]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR FAHRZEUGROLLSTABILISIERUNG[1999/42]
English:A VEHICLE ROLL STABILISING SYSTEM[1999/42]
French:SYSTEME DE STABILISATION DU ROULIS D'UN VEHICULE[1999/42]
Entry into regional phase01.06.1999National basic fee paid 
01.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
20.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.03.2003Fee for grant paid
29.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200105   M06   Fee paid on   01.03.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT18.06.2003
SE18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
[2008/08]
Former [2004/10]SE18.09.2003
ES29.09.2003
Former [2004/03]ES29.09.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2234946  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract * * page 2, line 9 - page 4, line 9 * * page 14 - page 18 *;
 [XA]EP0508825  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 37 - line 47 * [A] 2-10;
 [XA]JPS60203516  ;
 [Y]JPH02296524  ;
 [Y]JPH03164320  ;
 [Y]GB2284184  (ACG FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 22 * page 3, line 17 - page 5, line 8; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [XAY]JPH04224412  ;
 [PYA]EP0783986  (DELPHI FRANCE AUTOMOTIVE SYS [FR]) [PY] 11-19,22 * the whole document * [PA] 1;
 [A]DE4326447  (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11-19 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS62131811  ;
 [A]JPH0789319  ;
 [A]JPH02185817  ;
 [A]JPH07228124  ;
 [A]GB2235168  (GKN TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [A] * abstract *;
 [A]US5529324  (KRAWCZYK GREGORY J [US], et al);
 [A]EP0512358  (FIAT AUTO SPA [IT])
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860305), vol. 010, no. 055, Database accession no. (M - 458), [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-6
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910220), vol. 015, no. 073, Database accession no. (M - 1084), [Y] 1,11-13,22 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911011), vol. 015, no. 400, Database accession no. (M - 1167), [Y] 1,11-13 * abstract *
 [XAY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921216), vol. 016, no. 576, Database accession no. (M - 1345), [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-6 [Y] 11-19,22
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871118), vol. 011, no. 352, Database accession no. (M - 643), [A] 1,12,16-18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950831), vol. 095, no. 007, [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19901009), vol. 014, no. 464, Database accession no. (M - 1033), [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951226), vol. 095, no. 011, [A] * abstract *