Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0964652

EP0964652 - DEVICES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SHRINKING TISSUES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solarant Medical, Inc.
2675 Collier Canyon Road
Livermore, CA 94550 / US
[2005/01]
Former [1999/51]For all designated states
Surx, Inc.
Suite 417, 6900 Koll Center Parkway
Pleasanton, CA 95466 / US
Inventor(s)01 / INGLE, Frank
814 Richardson Court
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
02 / CARTER, Garry
3083 Crestblanca Drive
PLeasanton, CA 94566 / US
03 / LAUFER, Michael, D.
1259 El Camino Real
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[1999/51]
Representative(s)Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Avidity IP
Broers Building
Hauser Forum
21 J J Thomson Ave
Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/51]Bizley, Richard Edward , et al
Hepworth, Lawrence, Bryer & Bizley Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date97949369.905.11.1997
[1999/51]
WO1997US20191
Priority number, dateUS1996074852708.11.1996         Original published format: US 748527
US1997086287523.05.1997         Original published format: US 862875
US1997091037013.08.1997         Original published format: US 910370
[1999/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9819613
Date:14.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0964652
Date:22.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1998
[1999/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0964652
Date:18.08.2004
Language:EN
[2004/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/00, A61N1/05
[2004/13]
Former International [2000/28]A61B17/36, A61N1/05, A61B17/39
Former International [1999/51]A61B17/36, A61N1/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN, VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNGEN ZUR STRAFFUNG VON GEWEBE[1999/51]
English:DEVICES, METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR SHRINKING TISSUES[1999/51]
French:DISPOSITIFS, PROCEDES ET SYSTEMES PERMETTANT DE CONTRACTER DES TISSUS[1999/51]
Entry into regional phase08.06.1999National basic fee paid 
08.06.1999Search fee paid 
08.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
08.06.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/51]
27.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.06.2004Fee for grant paid
11.06.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.05.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.12.199903   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1999
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
IE05.11.2004
LU05.11.2004
ES06.11.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
PT18.01.2005
[2008/08]
Former [2007/17]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
IE05.11.2004
LU05.11.2004
ES06.11.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/50]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
IE05.11.2004
ES06.11.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/25]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
IE05.11.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2006/13]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
NL18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/48]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
MC30.11.2004
Former [2005/28]AT18.08.2004
BE18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/22]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
DK18.11.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/21]AT18.08.2004
CH18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
LI18.08.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/18]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
GR18.11.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/13]AT18.08.2004
FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/11]FI18.08.2004
SE18.11.2004
Former [2005/10]SE18.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[A]US5569242  (LAX RONALD G [US], et al);
 [PA]WO9715238  (ORATEC INTERVENTIONS INC [US]);
 [PA]WO9732532  (VNUS MED TECH INC [US])
International search[X]US5370675  (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al);
 [X]US5556396  (COHEN DONALD [US], et al);
 [YP]US5588960  (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al);
 [A]US5437664  (COHEN DONALD [US], et al);
 [A]US5370671  (MAURER DONALD D [US], et al)