Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0944543

EP0944543 - RECEIPT TRANSPORT AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2005
Database last updated on 12.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 18.01.2006  [2006/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diebold SST Holding Company, Inc.
5995 Mayfair Road
North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US
For all designated states
Diebold Holding Company, Inc.
5995 Mayfair Road
North Canton, Ohio 44720 / US
[2002/34]
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
InterBold
5995 Mayfair Road
North Canton Ohio 44720 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BRANNAN, Jeffrey, A.
5108 Beachview Circle, N.W.
Canton, OH 44708 / US
02 / VAN PHAM, Tuyen
2912 East Hills Drive
Lexington, KY 40515 / US
[1999/39]
Representative(s)Boden, Keith McMurray , et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London
EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Boden, Keith McMurray , et al
D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Former [1999/39]Purvis, William Michael Cameron
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date97949614.825.11.1997
[1999/39]
WO1997US21616
Priority number, dateUS19960031501P27.11.1996         Original published format: US 31501 P
US1997082756928.03.1997         Original published format: US 827569
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9823516
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0944543
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[1999/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0944543
Date:26.01.2005
Language:EN
[2005/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.08.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:B65H29/00, B65H31/30, B65H39/10, B65H5/06, G06K13/00, G06K13/08
[2005/03]
Former International [1999/39]B65H29/00, B65H31/30, B65H39/10, B65H5/06, G06F15/30, G06K13/00, G06K13/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/39]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN UND RÜCKFÜHREN EINER QUITTUNG FÜR EINEN GELDAUTOMATEN[2004/23]
English:RECEIPT TRANSPORT AND RETRIEVAL SYSTEM FOR AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE[1999/39]
French:SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT ET DE RECUPERATION DE QUITTANCE DESTINE A UN GUICHET AUTOMATIQUE BANCAIRE[1999/39]
Former [1999/39]SYSREM ZUM TRANSPORTIEREN UND RÜCKFÜHREN EINER QUITTUNG FÜR EINEN GELAUTOMATEN
Entry into regional phase04.06.1999National basic fee paid 
04.06.1999Search fee paid 
04.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
04.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
04.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/39]
25.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.01.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2004Fee for grant paid
12.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.10.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
08.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
11.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
09.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4867431  (HOSKING STEVEN M [GB], et al) [X] 1-14,19-25,27,28,30,31,38-41,48-50,52-54 * column 2, line 41 - column 5, line 48; figure - * [Y] 15,17,18,26,29,32-37,42,44-47,51,55-59;
 [YA]WO9525059  (INTERBOLD [US]) [Y] 15,17,18,26,29,51,55 * page 6, line 10 - line 21 * * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 13; figures 1-7 * [A] 1,14,21,23,38,48;
 [YA]EP0684141  (CANON APTEX INC [JP]) [Y] 32-37 * column 23, line 9 - column 25, line 23; figures 36-40 * [A] 23;
 [Y]JPS58157669
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19831216), vol. 7, no. 283, Database accession no. (M - 263)<1428> , [Y] 42,44-47,56-59 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5720478  (CARTER DANIEL L [US], et al);
 [Y]US5540544  (SACERDOTI CESARE [IT], et al);
 [Y]US5422467  (GRAEF HARRY T [US], et al);
 [Y]US5340100  (ROMANENKO MICHAEL [US]);
 [Y]US5340099  (ROMANENKO MICHAEL [US], et al);
 [Y]US5250793  (NAGASHIMA MASAYOSHI [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5136144  (SWINTON JAMES D [GB], et al);
 [Y]US4867431  (HOSKING STEVEN M [GB], et al);
 [Y]US4626672  (SAPITOWICZ THOMAS P [US], et al);
 [Y]US4456234  (SIMONOTTI LUCIO [IT], et al);
 [Y]US4019435  (DAVIS WILLIAM A);
 [Y]US4007356  (STUCKE ARTHUR W, et al)