EP0937226 - DISTRACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSAL PROPULSION COMPANY, Inc. 25401 North Central Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85027-7837 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/40] | For all designated states Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. 25401 North Central Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85027-7837 / US | ||
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states Universal Propulsion Company, Inc. 25401 North Central Avenue Phoenix AZ 85027-7837 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARLOG, Stanley, J. 14838 N. 24 Drive 13 Phoenix, AZ 85023 / US | 02 /
MAGENOT, Michael, C. 14618 N. 24 Place Phoenix, AZ 85032 / US | 03 /
ROBERTS, Wilburn, C. 2722 S. Pennington Mesa, AZ 85202 / US | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP The Beacon 176 St Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Moreland, David, Dr. Cruikshank & Fairweather, 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 97949665.0 | 13.11.1997 | [1999/34] | WO1997US21827 | Priority number, date | US19960751219 | 15.11.1996 Original published format: US 751219 | [1999/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9821541 | Date: | 22.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937226 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937226 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F42B27/00, F42B8/00, F42B4/00 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
F42B12/36 (EP,US);
F42B8/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/34] | Title | German: | UNTERHALTUNGSGERÄT | [1999/34] | English: | DISTRACTION DEVICE | [1999/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISTRACTION | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.1999 | Search fee paid | 26.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 26.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 22.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4976201 (HAMILTON JAMES E [US]) [X] 1,9,10,12-14 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - column 6, line 7 *; | [A]US5351623 (KISSEL ROBERT P [US], et al) [A] 1,9,10,12-14* abstract * | International search | [A]US1961364 (HUNTER REX A); | [A]US1994081 (HYACINTH WILLNERS); | [A]US2398545 (MACMILLAN DOUGLAS M, et al); | [A]DE1216158 (BUCK K G CHEMISCHE UND TECH QU); | [A]US3492945 (FILIPPI ERNEST ANTHONY); | [A]US3508518 (FLYNN JAMES P); | [X]US3795197 (LEVENSON M); | [A]US4697521 (ESPAGNACQ ANDRE [FR], et al); | [A]US4932328 (PINKNEY BARRY D [US], et al); | [A]US4938144 (DEMAREST SCOTT W [US]); | [A]FR2642160 (BRUNET HENRI [FR]); | [Y]US5085147 (GOLD ROBERT J [US], et al); | [A]US5094168 (RUMER KLAUS [DE]); | [A]FR2683626 (POUDRES & EXPLOSIFS STE NALE [FR]); | [A]US5610359 (SPECTOR YECHIEL [IL], et al) |