Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0936981

EP0936981 - GASBAG FOR AN AIRBAG MODULE, METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FOLDING A GAS BAG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TAKATA - PETRI AG
Bahnweg 1
63743 Aschaffenburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/39]For all designated states
TAKATA - PETRI Aktiengesellschaft
Bahnweg 1
63743 Aschaffenburg / DE
Former [1999/34]For all designated states
Petri AG
Bahnweg 1
63743 Aschaffenburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WERSTAT, Wolfram
Am Kirchplatz 8
D-16321 Bernau / DE
02 / STURM, Andreas
Uferpromenade 28a
D-14089 Berlin / DE
03 / MARKFORT, Dieter
Helmholtzstrasse 25
D-10587 Berlin / DE
04 / MALCZYK, Axel
Keplerstrasse 3a
D-10589 Berlin / DE
05 / ADOMEIT, Heinz-Dieter
Grolmanstrasse 16
D-10623 Berlin / DE
[1999/34]
Representative(s)Bärmann, Klaus , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann
Xantener Strasse 10
10707 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/34]Bärmann, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97949920.910.11.1997
[1999/34]
WO1997DE02665
Priority number, dateDE199614865415.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19648654
[1999/34]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9822311
Date:28.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0936981
Date:25.08.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998
[1999/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0936981
Date:18.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/20
[1999/34]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [1999/34]
TitleGerman:GASSACK FÜR EIN AIRBAGMODUL SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FALTUNG EINES GASSACKS[1999/34]
English:GASBAG FOR AN AIRBAG MODULE, METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FOLDING A GAS BAG[1999/34]
French:SAC A GAZ POUR UN MODULE AIRBAG, ET PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PLIAGE D'UN SAC A GAZ[1999/34]
Entry into regional phase01.06.1999National basic fee paid 
01.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/34]
04.03.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.06.2002Fee for grant paid
14.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES28.03.2003
[2004/04]
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0523704  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,9,12,14 * column 13, line 16 - line 57; figures 9A,11-17 * [Y] 11;
 [Y]DE19505507  (PETRI AG NIEDERLASSUNG BERLIN [DE]) [Y] 11 * column 4, line 4 - line 14; figure 10 *;
 [X]US5496061  (BROWN LOUIS R [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9,12,15 * column 4, paragraph 5; figures 1-6 * * column 5, paragraph 6; figures 9-11 *;
 [XAY]DE19516494  (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,2,4,12 * page 3, line 61 - page 4, line 24; figures 1-2C * * claims 1,13,14 * [A] 13 [Y] 3,5,14;
 [Y]GB2279046  (PETRI AG [DE]) [Y] 3,5,14 * figures 1-7; claim 1 * * page 15, line 34 - page 16, line 1; figures 9D,9E *;
 [A]US5360387  (BAKER WILLIAM F [US]) [A] 16 * column 2, line 35 - line 46 * * column 6, line 41 - column 9, line 32; figures 1,4-13 * * column 10, line 36 - line 58; figures 20A-20C *;
 [A]US5300011  (BUDDE WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 16 * column 7, line 3 - line 53; figures 1-3,9A-9F *
 [XA]  - "SIDE IMPACT AIR BAG AND METHOD FOR FOLDING", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19960501), no. 385, page 329/330, XP000599747 [X] 1-3,6,9,12,14 [A] 4,8,15
by applicantEP0705738
 EP0686531