Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0941571

EP0941571 - SWITCHING MODE POWER SUPPLY UNIT WITH A REGULATION OF THE OUTPUT VOLTAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.03.2002
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.03.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.05.2002  [2002/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81669 München / DE
[2001/20]
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Infineon Technologies AG
St.-Martin-Strasse 53
81541 München / DE
Former [1999/37]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / PRELLER, Peter
Heinrich-Schütz-Weg 5
D-81243 München / DE
[1999/37]
Representative(s)Zedlitz, Peter , et al
OSRAM GmbH
Intellectual Property IP
Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/48]Zedlitz, Peter, Dipl.-Inf. , et al
Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17
80503 München / DE
Application number, filing date97949930.814.11.1997
[1999/37]
WO1997DE02680
Priority number, dateDE199614940328.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19649403
[1999/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9824171
Date:04.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0941571
Date:15.09.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[1999/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0941571
Date:16.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02M3/28, H02M3/335
[1999/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/37]
TitleGerman:SCHALTNETZTEIL MIT REGELUNG DER AUSGANGSSPANNUNG[1999/37]
English:SWITCHING MODE POWER SUPPLY UNIT WITH A REGULATION OF THE OUTPUT VOLTAGE[1999/37]
French:UNITE D'ALIMENTATION A MODE DE COMMUTATION ET A REGULATION DE LA TENSION DE SORTIE[1999/37]
Entry into regional phase20.05.1999National basic fee paid 
20.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.05.1999Examination requested  [1999/37]
22.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.10.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2000Fee for grant paid
06.11.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0653831  (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-6 * page 5, line 8 - line 15; figure 5 *;
 [A]DE3501052  (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * page 6, line 5 - line 26; figure 1 *;
 [PA]EP0778659  (DELCO ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [PA] 1-6 * column 12, line 39 - line 51; figure 6C * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 15; figure 5A *