Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970303

EP0970303 - AMBIENT AIR-PULSED VALVE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2003
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.09.2003  [2003/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/02]
Inventor(s)01 / TORNO, Oskar
Schillerstrasse 10
D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
02 / KLUTH, Carsten
Sankt-Pöltener-Strasse 60a
D-70469 Stuttgart / DE
03 / HÄMING, Werner
Nachtigallenweg 15
D-74861 Neudenau / DE
04 / SURJADI, Iwan
Tannenweg 51
D-71665 Vaihingen / DE
05 / FRANKE, Steffen
Danziger Strasse 2
D-71701 Schwieberdingen / DE
06 / BÄUERLE, Michael
Marktplatz 13
D-71706 Markgröningen / DE
[2000/02]
Application number, filing date97949968.828.11.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997DE02779
Priority number, dateDE199711285027.03.1997         Original published format: DE 19712850
[2000/02]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9844249
Date:08.10.1998
Language:DE
[1998/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970303
Date:12.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970303
Date:25.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.10.1998
ClassificationInternational:F02D33/02, F02B37/16, F02B33/44
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   SE [2000/02]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN EINES SCHUBUMLUFTVENTILS[2000/02]
English:AMBIENT AIR-PULSED VALVE CONTROL[2000/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE SOUPAPE A AIR AMBIANT PULSE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase27.10.1999National basic fee paid 
27.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
25.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2002Fee for grant paid
18.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XA]US5083543  (HARADA YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 * * column 4, line 14 - line 33 * * column 5, line 33 - column 6, line 9 * [A] 3,5;
 [DXA]DE2823067  (NISSAN MOTOR) [DX] 1 * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 16, paragraph 2 - page 17, paragraph 2 * * figure 3 * [A] 3,6;
 [PXA]DE19639146  (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * claims 1,2 * * figure - * [PA] 5;
 [XA]JPH06117263  ;
 [A]US5103791  (TOMISAWA NAOKI [JP]) [A] 4 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 40 - line 58 *
 [XA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940729), vol. 018, no. 408, Database accession no. (M - 1647), [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3
by applicantDE2823067