Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0939986

EP0939986 - SWITCHING CABINET WITH A RACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.12.2001
Database last updated on 13.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2001No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.02.2002  [2002/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG
Auf dem Stützelberg
35745 Herborn / DE
[1999/36]
Inventor(s)01 / BENNER, Rolf
Wilhelmstrasse 8
D-35745 Herborn / DE
02 / KÖHLER, Martina
Am Eichelberg 1
D-35745 Herborn / DE
03 / MÜNCH, Udo
Wetzlarer Strasse 23
D-35764 Sinn / DE
04 / REUTER, Wolfgang
Dorfstrasse 16
D-57299 Burbach 5 / DE
[1999/36]
Representative(s)Fleck, Hermann-Josef
Jeck & Fleck
Patentanwälte
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/36]Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing.
Klingengasse 2
71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE
Application number, filing date97950128.506.11.1997
[1999/36]
WO1997EP06154
Priority number, dateDE199614779019.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19647790
[1999/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823010
Date:28.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0939986
Date:08.09.1999
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998
[1999/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0939986
Date:14.02.2001
Language:DE
[2001/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.05.1998
ClassificationInternational:H02B1/30, H02B1/01
[1999/36]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   IT,   SE [1999/36]
TitleGerman:SCHALTSCHRANK MIT EINEM RAHMENGESTELL[1999/36]
English:SWITCHING CABINET WITH A RACK[1999/36]
French:ARMOIRE DE DISTRIBUTION COMPORTANT UNE BAIE[1999/36]
Entry into regional phase21.06.1999National basic fee paid 
21.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/36]
03.04.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.04.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.2000Fee for grant paid
28.06.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2001No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2231117  (MARCONI CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 3 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DE8300044U  (BADER) [A] 1 * page 4, line 1 - line 16 * * figures 3,4 *;
 [A]DE1938879  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph 4 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0649205  (MERLIN GERIN [FR]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 1 - line 21 * * column 6, line 11 - line 52 * * column 8, line 45 - line 56 * * column 9, line 8 - line 17 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]FR2681403  (LEGRAND SA [FR]) [A] 3 * figures 2,3,13 *