EP0946221 - USE OF TAUROLIDINE OR TAURULTAM FOR THE PREVENTION AND THE TREATMENT OF INFECTIONS IN DELIVERY SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/40] | COMBATTING INFECTION IN DELIVERY SYSTEMS | ||
[2006/24] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ed. Geistlich Söhne AG für Chemische Industrie Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states Ed Geistlich Söhne AG Für Chemische Industrie Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | ||
Former [1999/40] | For all designated states Ed Geistlich Söhne AG Für Chemische Industrie Bahnhofstrasse 40 6110 Wolhusen / CH | ||
For:GB
Pett, Christopher Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEHNER, Joachim, Hermann Scherrweg 5 D-44309 Dortmund / DE | [1999/40] | Representative(s) | Barry, Robert Stewart Wilson Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Barry, Robert Stewart Wilson 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | ||
Former [2009/01] | Barry, Robert Stewart Wilson Barrys IP Lawyers Bracton House 34-36 High Holborn London WC1V 6AE / GB | ||
Former [2003/10] | Marsden, John Christopher, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1999/40] | Pett, Christopher Phineas, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97950310.9 | 23.12.1997 | [1999/40] | WO1997GB03524 | Priority number, date | GB19960026795 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: GB 9626795 | [1999/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828027 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0946221 | Date: | 06.10.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0946221 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61L29/00, A61P31/04 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L2/16 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61L2300/204 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/40] | A61L29/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/40] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON TAUROLIDINE ODER TAURULTAM ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PRÄVENTION VON INFEKTIONEN IN MEDIZINISCHEN FREISETZUNGSSYSTEMEN | [2006/24] | English: | USE OF TAUROLIDINE OR TAURULTAM FOR THE PREVENTION AND THE TREATMENT OF INFECTIONS IN DELIVERY SYSTEMS | [2006/24] | French: | UTILISATION DE TAUROLIDINE OU DE TAURULTAM POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PREVENTION DES INFECTIONS DANS DES DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION | [2006/24] |
Former [1999/40] | BEKÄMPFUNG VON INFEKTIONEN IN MEDIZINISCHEN FREISETZUNGSSYSTEMEN | ||
Former [1999/40] | COMBATTING INFECTION IN DELIVERY SYSTEMS | ||
Former [1999/40] | COMBATTRE LE DEVELOPPEMENT DE GERMES INFECTIEUX DANS DES DISPOSITIFS D'ADMINISTRATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/40] | 18.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2002 | Observations by third parties | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2003 | Observations by third parties | 28.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2005 | Observations by third parties | 26.10.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.10.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 09.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2007
29.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE TauroPharm GmbH Jägerstr. 5a 97297 Waldbüttelbrunn / DE Opponent's representative Andrae, Steffen, et al, et al Andrae l Westendorp Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2007
29.01.2007
ADMISSIBLE TauroPharm GmbH Mit Sitz in Würzburg Jägerstr. 5a 97297 Waldbüttelbrunn / DE Opponent's representative Andrae, Steffen, et al, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.01.2007
TauroPharm GmbH Mit Sitz in Würzburg Jägerstr. 5a 97297 Waldbüttelbrunn / DE Opponent's representative Andrae, Steffen, et al, et al Andrae Flach Haug Balanstrasse 55 81541 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 05.07.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.04.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.04.2009 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 23.06.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2011/24] | 23.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 24.04.2009 | Appeal received No. T0945/09 | 18.06.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.06.2010 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.06.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.07.2010 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Petition(s) for review: | 29.11.2010 | Petition for review received | Number: R0019/10 | for appeal No. T0945/09-3302 | Petitioner: APPR | 16.03.2011 | Decision: Petition for review obviously unsubstantiated only. | 16.03.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | 23.06.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 23.06.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.07.2004 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 30.08.2006 | LI | 30.08.2006 | [2011/38] | Cited in | International search | [X] - MUGHAL M. ET AL., "INFECTED FEEDING LINES", CARE OF THE CRITICALLY ILL, (1990), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 228 - 231, XP002062743 [X] 1,2,5 * page 230, column R, paragraph 4 - page 231, column L, paragraph 2 * | [X] - JOHNSTON D.A. ET AL, "TAUROLIN FOR THE PREVENTION OF PARENTERAL NUTRITION RELATED INFECTION: ANTIMICROBIAL ACTIVITY AND LONG-TERM USE", CLINICAL NUTRITION, (1993), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 365 - 368, XP002062744 [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0261-5614(93)90034-2 | [X] - BLENKHARN J. I., "THE ANTIMICROBIAL ACTIVITY OF TAUROLIN - A POSSIBLE ADDITIVE FOR PARENTERAL NUTRITION SOLUTIONS", CLINICAL NUTRITION, (1987), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 35 - 38, XP002062745 [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * page 37, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0261-5614(87)90066-5 | Examination | US5210083 | US5352204 | US5433705 | - Br.J.Surg. (1986) 76(1) pp. 15-21 | - Clinical Infectious Diseases (1995) 21 pp. 1286-1288 | - J. Paren. and Enter. Nutrit. (1988) 12(2) pp. 185-189 | other | US3423408 | US4587268 | US4960415 | US5077281 | US5210083 | US5263930 | US5352204 | US5433705 | US6146363 | US6174537 | - MUGHAL M.M., "Complications of intravenous feeding catheters", BR. J. SURG., (198901), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 15 - 21, XP002907596 | - REEVES D.S. AND SCHWEITZER F.A.W., "Experimental Studies with an Antibacterial Substance, Taurolin", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS OF CHEMOTHERAPY, (1974), vol. 2, pages 583 - 586, XP002907597 | - BENOIT J-L. ET AL, "Intraluminal Antibiotic Treatment of Central Venous Catheter Infections in Patients Receiving Parenteral Nutrition at Home", CLINICAL INFECTTIONS DISEASES, (1995), vol. 21, pages 1286 - 1288, XP002907598 | - MESSSING B. ET AL, "Antibiotic-Lock Technique: A New Approach to Optimal Therapy for Catheter-Related Sepsis in Home-Parenteral Nutrtion Patients", JOURNAL OF PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION, (1988), vol. 12, no. 2, pages 185 - 189, XP002907599 | - ELIAN J.C. ET AL, "Etude de la cinetique serique de la vancomycine au decours de la technique de << blocage in situ >>", ARCH. FR. PEDIATR., (1992), vol. 49, pages 357 - 360, XP002909101 | - ELIAN J.C. ET AL, "Study of the serum kinetics of vancomycin during the "antibiotic-lock technique", ARCH. FR. PEDIATR. (TRANSLATION INTO ENGLISH), (1992), vol. 49, pages 1 - 8, XP002909102 | - COWAN C.E., "Antibiotic Lock Technique", J. INTRAVENOUS NURS., (199209), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 283 - 287, XP002909103 | - PALM Ü. ET AL, "Verhinderung katheterbedingter Infektionen, eine experimentelle Langzeituntersuchung", DER ANESTHESIST, (1989), vol. 38, no. 1, page 129, XP002909104 | - PALM Ü. ET AL, "Prevention of vatheter-related infections by a new, catheter-restricted antibiotic filling technique", LABORATORY ANIMALS, (1991), vol. 25, pages 142 - 152, XP002909105 | - GAUDRY C. ET KOURILSKY O., "Est-il possible de conserver un catheter infecte ?", NEPHROLOGIE, (1994), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 171 - 172, XP002909106 | - GAUNDRY C. AND KOURILSKY C., "Is it possible to salvage an infected catheter ?", NEPHROLOGIE (ENGLISH TRANSLATION), (1994), vol. 15, XP002909107 | - JOHNSON D.C. ET AL, "Preliminary Results Treating Persistant Central Venous Catheter Infections with the Antibiotic Lock Technique in Pediatric Patients", PEDIATRIC INFECTIOUS DISEASE JOURNAL, (199410), vol. 13, no. 10, pages 930 - 931, XP002909108 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00006454-199410000-00015 | - YAZBECK F. ET AL, "THE ANTIBIOTIC LOCK TECHNIQUE USED IN AN INFECTED CATHETER: PREVENTIVE THERAPY", ANGIOACCESS FOR HEMODIALYSIS - AN INTERNATIONAL MULTIDISCIPLINARY SYMPOSIUM, (19960603), pages 189 - 190, XP002909109 | - GAILLARD J-L. ET AL, "Conventional and Nonconventional Modes of Vancomycin Administration to Decontaminate the Internal Surface of Catheters Colonized with Coagulase-Negative Staphylococci", JOURNAL OF PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION, (1990), vol. 14, no. 6, pages 593 - 597, XP002909110 | - KRZYWDA E.A. ET AL, "Treatment of Hickman Catheter Sepsis Using Antibiotic Lock Technique", INFECTION CONTROL AND HOSPITAL EPIDEMIOLOGY, (199510), vol. 16, pages 596 - 598, XP002909111 | - BREGENZER T., "Bloodstream Infection From a Port-A-Cath: With the Antibiotic Lock Technique", INFECTION CONTROL AND HOSPITAL EPIDEMIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 17, page 772, XP002909112 | - HENRICKSON K.J. AND DUNNE W.M. JR., "Modification of Central Venous Catheter Flush Solution Improves In Vitro Antimicrobial Activity", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (1992), vol. 166, pages 944 - 946, XP002909113 | - ROOT J.L. ET AL, "Inhibitory Effect of Disodium EDTA upon the Growth of Staphylococcus epidermidis In Vitro: Relation to Infection Prophylaxis of Hickman Catheters", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1988), vol. 32, no. 11, pages 1627 - 1631, XP002909114 | - SCHWARTZ C. ET AL, "Prevention of Bacteremia Attributed to Luminal Colonization of Tunneled Central Venous Catheters With Vancomycin-Susceptible Organisms", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL OONCOLOGY, (199009), vol. 8, no. 9, pages 1591 - 1596, XP002909115 | - WINTERS V. ET AL, "A Trial With a New Peripheral Implanted Vascular Access Device", ONC. NURS. FOR., (1990), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 891 - 896, XP002909116 | - WORTHLEY L.I.G., "Treatment of Central Venous Silastic Catheter Infections Using Hydrochloric Acid", ANAESTHESIA AND INTENSIVE CARE, (198211), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 314 - 318, XP002909117 | - ELLIOTT T.S.J. AND CURRAN A., "Effects of heparin and chlorbutol on bacterial colonisation of intravascular cannulae in an in vitro model", JOURNAL OF HOSPITAL INFECTION, (1989), vol. 14, pages 193 - 200, XP002909118 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0195-6701(89)90035-2 | - JOHNSTON D.A. ET AL, "Antimicrobial activity and long-term use of Taurolin as an additive to parenteral nutrition", PROCEEDINGS NUTRITION SOC. (MEETING OF 2/3 DECEMBER 1992), (1993), vol. 52, page 245A, XP002909119 | - BLENKHARN J.I., "Prevention of Septic Complications Associated with TPN", J. PAREN. & ENTER. NUTRITION, (1986), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 436 - 437, XP002909120 | - KNIGHT B.I. ET AL, "NMR Studies and GC Analysis of the Antibacterial Agent Taurolidine", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (198306), vol. 72, no. 6, pages 705 - 707, XP002909121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600720630 | - MEYERS E. ET AL, "The Relationship between Structure and Activity of Taurolin", JOURNAL OF APPLIED BACTERIOLOGY, (1980), vol. 48, pages 89 - 96, XP002909122 | - BROWNE M.K. ET AL, "Taurolin, a New Chemotherapeutic Agent", JOURNAL OF APPLIED BACTERIOLOGY, (1976), vol. 41, pages 363 - 368, XP002909123 | - BREARLEY S. AND GEORGE R.H., "The rate of antimicrobial action of noxythiolin and taurolin", JOURNAL OF HOSPITAL INFECTION, (1980), vol. 1, pages 201 - 209, XP002909124 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0195-6701(80)90057-2 | - BROWNE M.K. ET AL, "THE IN VITRO AND IN VIVO ACTIVITY OF TAUROLIN AGAINST ANAEROBIC PATHOGENIC ORGANISMS", SURGERY, GYNECOLOGY & OBSTETRICS, (197712), vol. 145, pages 842 - 846, XP002909125 | - TRAUB W.H. ET AL, "Taurolidine: in vitro Activity against Multiple-Antibiotic-Resistant, Nosocomially Significant Clinical Isolates of Staphylococcus aureus, Enterococcus faecium, and Diverse Enterobacteriaceae", CHEMOTHERAPY, (1993), vol. 39, pages 322 - 330, XP002909126 | - STEDMAN'S MEDICAL DICTIONARY, WILLIAMS & WILKINS, (1995), vol. 26, ISBN 0-683-07922-0, XP002909127 | - BUDAVARI S. ET AL, THE MERCK INDEX, WHITEHOUSE STATION, NJ, MERCK & CO.,INC., (1996), vol. 12, XP002909128 | - How to Care For Your Groshong Catheter, C.R.BARD, INC., (1994), XP002909129 | - GORMAN S.P. ET AL, "A COMPARATIVE STUDY OF THE MICROBIAL ANTI-ADHERENCE CAPACITIES OF THREE ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACY AND THERAPEUTICS, (1987), vol. 12, pages 393 - 399, XP002909130 | - FARBER B.F. ET AL, "Staphylococcus epidermidis Extracted Slime Inhibits the Antimicrobial Action of Glycopeptide Antibiotics", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (199001), vol. 161, pages 37 - 40, XP002909131 | - RAAD I. ET AL, "Minocycline and Ethylenediaminetetraacetate for the Prevention of Recurrent Vascular Catheter Infections", CLINICAL INFECTIOUS DESEASES, (1997), vol. 25, pages 149 - 151, XP002959745 | - JUREWITSCH B. ET AL, "Taurolidine 2% as an antimicrobial lock solution for prevention of recurrent catheter-related bloodstream infections", JOURNAL OF PARENTERAL AND ENTERAL NUTRITION, (1998), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 242 - 244, XP002991455 |