Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0946221 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0946221



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1586
10.05.2011 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 2
11.04.2011 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
11.04.2011 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
11.04.2011 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 17
11.04.2011 Decision of the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 15
22.03.2011 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
16.03.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
16.03.2011 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
14.03.2011 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 4
21.02.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 4
16.02.2011 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 6
31.01.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 3
17.01.2011 Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure Appeal 3
17.01.2011 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2011 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
13.01.2011 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
09.12.2010 Letter relating to review procedure Appeal 4
09.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.12.2010 Communication of the Registry during review procedure Appeal 2
30.11.2010 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
30.11.2010 Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure Appeal 1
29.11.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 7
29.11.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.11.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
02.11.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
20.10.2010 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 22
21.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
21.09.2010 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 21
19.07.2010 Letter which had not been notified Appeal 3
01.07.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
01.07.2010 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 4
21.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.06.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
15.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
11.06.2010 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 1
10.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.06.2010 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 2
07.06.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
07.06.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
07.06.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
07.06.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
28.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 15
25.05.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
25.05.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 20
25.05.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.05.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
25.05.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
25.05.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.05.2010 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 22
05.03.2010 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
02.03.2010 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
25.02.2010 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
25.02.2010 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
12.02.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
17.01.2010 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
17.01.2010 Miscellaneous requests concerning client data Appeal 1
15.01.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Appeal 1
11.01.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.01.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 18
02.01.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
21.12.2009 Fax relating to Appeal procedure Appeal 19
21.12.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
18.12.2009 Document concerning representation Appeal 1
12.08.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
28.07.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 47
01.07.2009 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
30.06.2009 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
18.06.2009 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 32
18.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
18.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
18.06.2009 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 5
08.05.2009 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
29.04.2009 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
24.04.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
24.04.2009 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
04.04.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
03.04.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
02.04.2009 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
02.04.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 21
02.04.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
02.04.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 10
04.03.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
20.01.2009 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
16.01.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.01.2009 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.01.2009 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
16.01.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 4
14.01.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.2009 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.01.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 7
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Opposition 1
01.12.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Opposition 1
28.11.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 5
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 31
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Claims Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Claims Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Cover sheet for fax transmission Opposition 1
20.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
20.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
20.11.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
20.11.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 6
20.11.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 17
18.11.2008 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
18.11.2008 Document concerning representation Opposition 1
04.11.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.11.2008 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Opposition 1
03.11.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
09.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.09.2008 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.09.2008 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent Opposition 1
14.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
08.08.2008 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
07.08.2008 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
04.08.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
04.08.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
04.08.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 2
04.08.2008 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 4
04.08.2008 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
04.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
04.08.2008 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
24.07.2008 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
15.07.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
09.07.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.07.2008 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
09.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.07.2008 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
23.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.11.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
16.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
16.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
16.11.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
14.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.11.2007 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
14.11.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
14.11.2007 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 14
05.07.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
05.07.2007 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.06.2007 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.05.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 19
30.05.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 11
30.05.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
30.05.2007 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
30.05.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 11
23.01.2007 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
18.01.2007 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
18.01.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
18.01.2007 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
03.08.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.07.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.07.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
18.07.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
14.07.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
14.07.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
14.07.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
14.07.2006 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
01.06.2006 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
01.06.2006 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.06.2006 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
27.04.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
17.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
15.03.2006 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
09.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
09.02.2006 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 16
21.12.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.12.2005 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
21.12.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
31.10.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
28.10.2005 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
28.10.2005 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
26.10.2005 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
26.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
26.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
26.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
26.10.2005 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
26.10.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
24.10.2005 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
24.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 6
24.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 3
24.10.2005 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
21.10.2005 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
21.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 3
21.10.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
21.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 13
21.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
21.10.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 2
21.10.2005 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 2
26.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 14
23.09.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 15
26.08.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 5
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
26.08.2005 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
17.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.05.2005 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.04.2005 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
16.02.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
16.02.2005 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.02.2005 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
09.07.2004 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
24.06.2004 Claims Search / examination 1
24.06.2004 Description Search / examination 1
24.06.2004 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.06.2004 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 7
24.06.2004 Request for further processing Search / examination 4
23.06.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 14
13.04.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.01.2004 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
09.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.01.2004 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.08.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
28.08.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
10.03.2003 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
10.03.2003 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
27.02.2003 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 3
27.02.2003 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
27.02.2003 Observations by third parties Search / examination 6
18.02.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
18.02.2003 Claims Search / examination 1
18.02.2003 Description Search / examination 7
18.02.2003 Description Search / examination 6
18.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.02.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 12
16.01.2003 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
03.01.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.12.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
16.12.2002 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 2
21.10.2002 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
16.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.2002 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.06.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
04.06.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.03.2002 Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations Search / examination 1
28.03.2002 Transmittal of third party observations to applicant Search / examination 1
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 6
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 9
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 6
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 9
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 8
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 12
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 36
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 2
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 10
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 4
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 11
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 2
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 1
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 7
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 8
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 4
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 12
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 4
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 6
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 8
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 3
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 6
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Annex Search / examination 4
19.03.2002 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 4
19.03.2002 Citation filed by a third party Search / examination 5
19.03.2002 Observations by third parties Search / examination 46
31.10.2001 Claims Search / examination 1
31.10.2001 Description Search / examination 2
31.10.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
29.10.2001 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
30.08.2001 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.08.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.08.2001 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
18.04.2001 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
18.04.2001 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
29.08.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
25.05.1999 Claims Search / examination 1
25.05.1999 Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure Search / examination 1
25.05.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.09.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
02.07.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
02.07.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 14
02.07.1998 Priority document Search / examination 14