Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0901341

EP0901341 - BEND-RESPONSIVE CATHETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2005
Database last updated on 21.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.12.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 08.02.2006  [2006/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biosense Webster, Inc.
3333 Diamond Canyon Road
Diamond Bar, CA 91765 / US
[N/P]
Former [2004/45]For all designated states
Biosense Webster, Inc.
3333 Diamond Canyon Road
Diamond Bar, California 91765 / US
Former [1999/11]For all designated states
BIOSENSE, INC.
9360 Sunset Drive, Suite 283
Miami, Florida 33173 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BEN-HAIM, Shlomo
Yeffe Nof Street 101
34454 Haifa / IL
[1999/11]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/11]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date97950367.931.12.1997
[1999/11]
WO1997IL00449
Priority number, dateUS19970034703P03.01.1997         Original published format: US 34703 P
US19970034704P03.01.1997         Original published format: US 34704 P
[1999/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9829033
Date:09.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0901341
Date:17.03.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998
[1999/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0901341
Date:16.02.2005
Language:EN
[2005/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05, A61B1/005
[2000/14]
Former International [1999/11]A61B5/05
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/11]
Extension statesSI02.10.1998
TitleGerman:KRÜMMUNGSEMPFINDLICHER KATHETER[1999/11]
English:BEND-RESPONSIVE CATHETER[1999/11]
French:CATHETER SENSIBLE A UNE COURBURE[1999/11]
Entry into regional phase02.10.1998National basic fee paid 
02.10.1998Search fee paid 
02.10.1998Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.1998Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.1998Examination requested  [1999/11]
20.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.2004Fee for grant paid
02.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04077532.2  / EP1491139
Opposition(s)17.11.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5269289  (TAKEHANA SAKAE [JP], et al);
 [Y]US5253647  (TAKAHASHI YUTAKA [JP], et al)
Examination US5273025
  WO9605768
by applicantUS5391199
 WO9605768
 WO9504938
 US5042486
 WO9203090