Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975524

EP0975524 - ZIPPER SLIDER PIVOTING WEDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.12.2004
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.01.2005  [2005/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pliant Solutions Corporation
1475 Woodfield Road, Suite 700
Schaumburg, IL 60173 / US
[2004/22]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
KCL CORPORATION
Hodell and Prospect Streets
Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US
Inventor(s)01 / STOLMEIER, Robert, C.
2423 Overlook Drive
Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US
02 / O'CONNOR, Thomas, P.
379 West Broadway
Shelbyville, IN 46176 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)WP Thompson
138 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]W.P. THOMPSON & CO.
Eastcheap House Central Approach
Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB
Application number, filing date97950621.912.11.1997
[2000/05]
WO1997US21001
Priority number, dateUS1996075817025.11.1996         Original published format: US 758170
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823493
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0975524
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[2000/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0975524
Date:04.02.2004
Language:EN
[2004/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2001
ClassificationInternational:B65D33/25, A44B19/26
[2001/48]
Former International [2000/05]B65D33/25
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   NL [2000/05]
TitleGerman:GLEITVERSCHLUSSÖFFNUNGSVORRICHTUNG VERSEHEN MIT EINEM SCHWENKBAREN KEIL[2000/05]
English:ZIPPER SLIDER PIVOTING WEDGE[2000/05]
French:CALE PIVOTANTE POUR FERMETURE A GLISSIERE[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase24.06.1999National basic fee paid 
24.06.1999Search fee paid 
24.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
24.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
24.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
11.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.02.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2003Fee for grant paid
03.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[E]FR2770493  (FLEXICO FRANCE SARL [FR]) [E] 1,11,23 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 7 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 10; figures 3-6 *;
 [A]US3790992  (HERZ A) [A] 1-3,6,8,10,11,23 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 19; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US5211482  (TILMAN PAUL A [US]) [A] 1,11,23 * column 3, line 30 - line 54; figures 3-6 *
International search[A]US3426396  (LAGUERRE LEON KER);
 [A]US3660875  (GUTMAN ISAJ);
 [A]US5063644  (HERRINGTON F JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US5067208  (HERRINGTON JR F JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US5426830  (RICHARDSON DALE S [US], et al);
 [A]US5664299  (PORCHIA JOSE [US], et al)