Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034449

EP1034449 - TEMPERATURE CONTROL FOR MICROSCOPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.06.2003
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.06.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.07.2003  [2003/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
1144 East Market Street
Akron, OH 44316-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
1144 East Market Street
Akron, Ohio 44316-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARNOLD, William, Allen
1019 Pitkin Avenue
Akron, OH 44310 / US
02 / MARTENY, Perry
850 Treeside Drive
Stow, OH 44224 / US
03 / MARCELLI, Angela, Marie
1842 Koons Road
North Canton, OH 44720 / US
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Leitz, Paul , et al
Goodyear Technical Center, Patent Department, Avenue Gordon Smith
7750 Colmar-Berg / LU
[2000/37]
Application number, filing date97950897.525.11.1997
[2000/37]
WO1997US22513
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927407
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034449
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034449
Date:31.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02B21/30, G02B21/28, G01B7/34, G05D23/00
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesDE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:TEMPERATURKONTROLLE FÜR DIE MIKROSKOPIE[2000/37]
English:TEMPERATURE CONTROL FOR MICROSCOPY[2000/37]
French:REGULATION DE TEMPERATURE POUR METHODE D'OBSERVATION AU MICROSCOPE[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2000National basic fee paid 
26.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
18.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.11.2001Fee for grant paid
27.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.01.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)06.05.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30]
Request for further processing for:05.01.2002Request for further processing filed
07.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.05.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US5257128  (DILLER KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,8-11,16,17,18,19 * column 6, line 23 - column 7, line 35 * * column 10, line 10 - line 21 * * column 10, line 57 - line 58 *;
 [A]JPS59218417
 [XA]  - MILLER R J ET AL, "A COMPUTER INTERFACED HIGH-STABILITY TEMPERATURE CONTROLLER AND HEATING STAGE FOR OPTICAL MICROSCOPY", MEASUREMENT SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (19940801), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 904 - 911, XP000459458 [X] 1-3,5-7,10,12-17 * the whole document * [A] 4,8,9,11,18,19

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0957-0233/5/8/006
 [A]  - LIDE D.R., CRC Handbook of Chemistry and Physics. Ready-reference book of chemical and physical data, US,BOCA RATON, CRC PRESS, (1996), XP002071198 [A] 12,14 * pages 12-176 * * pages 12-179 *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850419), vol. 009, no. 090, Database accession no. (P - 350), & JP59218417 A 19841208 (OOSAKA SANSO KOGYO KK) [A] 18,19 * abstract *