Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021939

EP1021939 - MODULAR ELECTRIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.2005  [2005/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ROHNE, Klaus
Schöne Aussicht 13
D-09350 Lichtenstein / DE
02 / BEYER, Hans-Jürgen
Poststrasse 8
D-08134 Wildenfels / DE
03 / MEIER, Frank-Günter
Folgenstrasse 18
D-09212 Limbach-Oberfrohna / DE
[2000/30]
Application number, filing date97951104.501.12.1997
[2000/30]
WO1997DE02805
Priority number, dateDE199615196113.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19651961
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9826640
Date:18.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1021939
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021939
Date:07.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/15]
Search report(s)International search reportEP17.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/02, H05K7/14
[2003/05]
Former International [2000/30]H05K7/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/30]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT MIT MODULARER AUFBAUTECHNIK[2000/30]
English:MODULAR ELECTRIC APPARATUS[2000/30]
French:APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE DE CONCEPTION MODULAIRE[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase07.06.1999National basic fee paid 
07.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/30]
21.01.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.02.2004Fee for grant paid
02.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
16.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0364618  (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2; claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]EP0589786  (PROFESSIONAL GENERAL ELECT [FR]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0382345  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4401351  (RECORD GRANT C [US]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *