EP0939990 - ASSEMBLY UNIT WITH AN ASSEMBLY RAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.2002 [2002/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rittal-Werk Rudolf Loh GmbH & Co. KG Auf dem Stützelberg 35745 Herborn / DE | [1999/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNER, Rolf Wilhelmstrasse 8 D-35745 Herborn / DE | 02 /
KÖHLER, Martina Am Eichelberg 1 D-35745 Herborn / DE | 03 /
MÜNCH, Udo Wetzlarer Strasse 23 D-35764 Sinn / DE | 04 /
REUTER, Wolfgang Dorfstrasse 16 D-57299 Burbach 5 / DE | [1999/36] | Representative(s) | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, et al Jeck, Fleck & partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/36] | Fleck, Hermann-Josef, Dr.-Ing., et al Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 97951137.5 | 06.11.1997 | [1999/36] | WO1997EP06143 | Priority number, date | DE19961047781 | 19.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19647781 | [1999/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9823011 | Date: | 28.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0939990 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0939990 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/32 | [1999/36] | CPC: |
H02B1/01 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/36] | Title | German: | MONTAGEEINHEIT MIT EINER MONTAGESCHIENE | [1999/36] | English: | ASSEMBLY UNIT WITH AN ASSEMBLY RAIL | [1999/36] | French: | UNITE DE MONTAGE COMPORTANT UN RAIL DE MONTAGE | [1999/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.1999 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/36] | 03.04.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE4336187 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK) [Y] 1,4-8 * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 33 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]FR2420233 (SAREL) [Y] 1,4-8 * column 4, line 15 - line 20 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE9205762U (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - line 20 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE8800227U (QUANTE) [A] 1 * page 3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4336204 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK) [A] 3 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 8 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19537016 (LOH KG RITTAL WERK) [A] 4,5 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 30 * * figure 3 * |