blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0957895 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0957895



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 137
19.11.2001 Closing of application Search / examination 3
08.08.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
10.04.2000 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
25.02.2000 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
23.02.2000 European search report Search / examination 1
13.10.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.08.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
23.06.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
10.06.1999 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.06.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
07.06.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
09.09.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.06.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.06.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 38
18.06.1998 Priority document Search / examination 40
16.03.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 22
16.03.1998 Citation for the examination procedure Search / examination 6