blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0957895


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  09.01.2002  [2002/02]
03.08.2001 Application deemed to be withdrawn
01.02.2001 Surcharge for renewal fee
25.02.2000 Change - classification published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
18.02.2000 Supplementary search report published on  05.04.2000 [2000/14]
08.10.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.11.1999 [1999/47]
08.10.1999 Request for examination filed published on  24.11.1999 [1999/47]
04.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.1999 Renewal fee
23.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
15.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
30.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
11.08.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
06.02.1998 PCT data prior to European publication