Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0957895

EP0957895 - SHAVING COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING PSEUDOFOLLICULITIS BARBAE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Willis, Isaac
1141 Regency Road, N.W.
Atlanta, GA 30327 / US
[1999/47]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIS, Isaac
1141 Regency Road N.W.
Atlanta, GA 30327 / US
02 / DARKWA, Adu, Gyamfi
20129 Mohawk Trail
Olympia Fields, IL 60461 / US
03 / VILLANUEVA, Apolonio, L.
805 Downing Street
Northbrook, IL 60062 / US
[1999/47]
Representative(s)MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [1999/47]MacDougall, Donald Carmichael , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date97951521.008.12.1997
[1999/47]
WO1997US22044
Priority number, dateUS1996076639512.12.1996         Original published format: US 766395
[1999/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9825581
Date:18.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0957895
Date:24.11.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[1999/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US18.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/15, A61K7/06
[2000/15]
Former International [1999/47]A61K7/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/47]
TitleGerman:RASIERMITTEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON PSEUDOFOLLICULITIS BARBAE[1999/47]
English:SHAVING COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREVENTING PSEUDOFOLLICULITIS BARBAE[1999/47]
French:COMPOSITION DE RASAGE ET PROCEDE DE PREVENTION DE LA PSEUDO-FOLLICULITE[1999/47]
Entry into regional phase14.06.1999National basic fee paid 
14.06.1999Search fee paid 
14.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
14.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
14.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/47]
03.07.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/02]
08.08.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2002/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9619183  (COSMEDERM TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [A] 1-60 * page 10, lines 5-26 * * page 13, lines 12-21 * * page 19, lines 8,9 * * page 20, line 18 - page 21, line 17 * * page 26, line 19 - page 27, line 9 * * claims 1,6,7,10,31,52,53,57,64,69,81,84,95,104,118 *;
 [A]FR2186220  (LEWIS JOHN [GB]) [A] 1-60 * page 1, lines 1-20 * * page 2, lines 4-34 * * page 3, lines 1-12 * * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-5 *;
 [A]US4228163  (BLISS WILLIAM E) [A] 1-60 * column 1, lines 1-51 * * column 2, lines 5-40 * * examples 1-3 *;
 [A]US5380530  (HILL IRA D [US]) [A] 1-60 * column 3, lines 8-33 *
International search[X]US4944939  (MOORE MILTON D [US]);
 [Y]US5567428  (HUGHES KENDRICK J [US])