Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967931

EP0967931 - ANATOMICAL RESTORATION DENTAL IMPLANT SYSTEM FOR POSTERIOR AND ANTERIOR TEETH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.09.2006
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.2006  [2006/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daftary, Fereidoun
9001 Wilshire Boulevard, No. 205
Beverly Hills, CA 90211 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2002/09]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Former [2000/01]Baillie, Iain Cameron
Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date97951598.824.11.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US22514
Priority number, dateUS1996075840029.11.1996         Original published format: US 758400
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823221
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967931
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967931
Date:26.10.2005
Language:EN
[2005/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61C13/12, A61C8/00
[2001/32]
Former International [2000/01]A61C13/12
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ZAHNIMPLANTATSYSTEM ZUR ANATOMISCHEN RESTORATION VON HINTEREN UND VORDEREN ZÄHNEN[2000/01]
English:ANATOMICAL RESTORATION DENTAL IMPLANT SYSTEM FOR POSTERIOR AND ANTERIOR TEETH[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME D'IMPLANT DENTAIRE DE RESTAURATION ANATOMIQUE DE DENTS POSTERIEURES ET ANTERIEURES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase25.06.1999National basic fee paid 
25.06.1999Search fee paid 
25.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
23.01.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2005Fee for grant paid
30.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.07.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.06.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
20.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
26.10.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE26.01.2006
[2006/27]
Documents cited:Search[YA]US5246370  (COATOAM GARY W [US]) [Y] 23,25,27-34,46,49-52,56 * column 3, line 39 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 42 - column 5, line 9 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 1,9,17,35,58-61;
 [Y]US5492471  (SINGER GARY [US]) [Y] 23,25,27-34,46,49-52,56 * column 7, lines 14-50 * * column 9, line 40 - column 10, line 24 * * figures 1-17 *
International search[Y]US4904187  (ZINGHEIM WILLIAM F [US]);
 [Y]US5368483  (SUTTER FRANZ [CH], et al);
 [Y]US5316476  (KRAUSER JACK T [US]);
 [Y]US5431567  (DAFTARY FEREIDOUN [US]);
 [A]US2857670  (KIERNAN JR THOMAS F)
by applicantUS5035619
 US5073111
 US5145372
 US5297963
 US5431567
 US5015186
 US5030095
 US5049074