blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0954950

EP0954950 - OVERHEATING PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A CONTROL DEVICE IN GAS DISCHARGE LAMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[1999/45]
Inventor(s)01 / SEILER, Hartmut
In den Schweigrother Matten
D-76532 Baden-Baden / DE
02 / KERN, Robert
Albert-Schneble-Strasse 28
D-77830 Bühlertal / DE
[1999/45]
Application number, filing date97951831.308.12.1997
[1999/45]
WO1997DE02853
Priority number, dateDE199710268725.01.1997         Original published format: DE 19702687
[1999/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9833360
Date:30.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0954950
Date:10.11.1999
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0954950
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:H05B41/36
[1999/45]
CPC:
F21V25/10 (EP,US); H05B41/2856 (EP,US); Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/45]
TitleGerman:ANORDNUNG ZUM SCHUTZ GEGEN ÜBERTEMPERATUR EINES STEUERGERÄTS FÜR GASENTLADUNGSLAMPEN[1999/45]
English:OVERHEATING PROTECTION DEVICE FOR A CONTROL DEVICE IN GAS DISCHARGE LAMPS[1999/45]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR PROTEGER CONTRE UN ECHAUFFEMENT UN APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DESTINE A DES LAMPES A DECHARGE[1999/45]
Entry into regional phase25.08.1999National basic fee paid 
25.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
25.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/45]
05.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2001Fee for grant paid
15.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XP]US5635799  (HESTERMAN BRYCE L [US]) [XP] 1 * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 63; figure 1 *;
 [X]US4355344  (FELICI MAURIZIO, et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 28 - column 4, line 50 *;
 [A]DE4406533  (TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GES MBH [AT]) [A] 1-5 * column W *;
 [A]WO9622007  (CHUNG YEONG CHOON [KR]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 3 - page 9, line 13; figures 1,2 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.