Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973565

EP0973565 - MEDICAL DEVICE FOR INJECTING LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Change - classificationpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMC-Swiss Medical Care S.A.
Avenue de Sevelin 28
1004 Lausanne / CH
[2004/44]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
DEBIOTECH S.A.
17, rue des Terreaux
1001 Lausanne 9 / CH
Inventor(s)01 / NEFTEL, Frédéric
17, rue des Terreaux
CH-1003 Lausanne / CH
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Dronne, Guy , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Dronne, Guy , et al
Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université
75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date97952096.218.12.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997FR02341
Priority number, dateFR1996001555118.12.1996         Original published format: FR 9615551
[2000/04]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826818
Date:25.06.1998
Language:FR
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0973565
Date:26.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0973565
Date:10.11.2004
Language:FR
[2004/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00, A61M5/142
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/04]
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUM INJIZIEREN VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN[2000/04]
English:MEDICAL DEVICE FOR INJECTING LIQUID[2000/04]
French:DISPOSITIF MEDICAL D'INJECTION DE LIQUIDE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase10.06.1999National basic fee paid 
10.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
02.04.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.10.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2004Fee for grant paid
19.08.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
17.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
21.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
18.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
17.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Former [2018/28]ES10.11.2004
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0648513  (MEDEX SA [FR]) [A] 1,4,7,12,15 * column 5, line 9 - line 16 * * column 6, line 33 - line 48 * * column 9, line 5 - line 21 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]US5569208  (WOELPPER WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1,12,41 * column 2, line 14 - line 23 * * column 6, line 34 - line 38 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0650739  (MEDRAD INC [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 13 - line 23 * * figure 1; claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]US5533978  (TEIRSTEIN PAUL S [US]) [A] 1,16 * column 5, line 20 - line 38 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US5569181  (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [A] 1,4,41 * column 4, line 6 - line 14 * * figure 1 *