Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967929

EP0967929 - SINGLE DOSE DENTAL ADHESIVE DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD AND ADHESIVE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.01.2005
Database last updated on 15.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2006Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.03.2006  [2006/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE KERR CORPORATION
1717 West Collins Avenue
Orange, CA 92867 / US
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / PRANITIS, Leo, J., Jr.
1960 Nice Drive
Corona, CA 91720 / US
02 / NG, Daniel
22640 Weatherly Court
Wildomar, CA 92595 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
Application number, filing date97952186.114.11.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US20773
Priority number, dateUS1996075838329.11.1996         Original published format: US 758383
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9823220
Date:04.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967929
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967929
Date:03.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61C5/06, A61C19/02, A61K6/083
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/01]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGABE EINER EINMAL-DOSIS EINES ZAHNÄRZTLICHEN HAFTMITTELS[2000/01]
English:SINGLE DOSE DENTAL ADHESIVE DELIVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD AND ADHESIVE THEREFOR[2000/01]
French:SYSTEME DE DEBIT UNIDOSE D'ADHESIF DENTAIRE, PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT, ET ADHESIF DESTINE A CET EFFET[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase31.05.1999National basic fee paid 
31.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
31.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
06.03.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.10.2003Fee for grant paid
21.10.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP03077694.2  / EP1366726
Opposition(s)06.12.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB14.11.2004
[2006/13]
Cited inInternational search[YA]WO9603326  (CENTRIX INC [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,9,16,20-26 * page 1, lines 4-14 * * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 10 * * page 21, lines 20-26 * * figures 1-3,10-15 * [A] 17-19;
 [YA]US5538129  (CHESTER BRUCE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,24-26 * column 2, lines 51-63 * * column 4, lines 27-57 * * column 7, lines 13-34 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 6,7,12-15;
 [DY]DE9202654U  (SOGARO VERTRIEB UND VERWALTUNG) [DY] 8,9,16,20-23 * page 2, lines 15-26 * * page 3, lines 6-18 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]EP0688541  (HOFACKER ERICH [DE]) [X] 1,24-26 * column 1, lines 28-37 * * figure - *
by applicantUS5348988