Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007913

EP1007913 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING LIQUID-PROBE CONTACT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.07.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
bioMérieux, Inc.
100 Rodolphe Street
Durham, NC 27712 / US
[2005/29]
Former [2002/01]For all designated states
bioMérieux, Inc.
100 Akzo Avenue
Treyburn Durham, NC 27712 / US
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
AKZO NOBEL N.V.
Velperweg 76, Postbus 186
6800 LS Arnhem / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BALL, Stuart, R.
741 Okie Ridge
Yukon, OK 73099 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Prins, Hendrik Willem , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Prins, Hendrik Willem , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2002/01]Prins, Hendrik Willem , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Former [2000/24]Van Gent, Marieke , et al
P.O.Box 20 Wethoudervan Eschstraat 1
5340 BH Oss / NL
Application number, filing date97952403.015.12.1997
[2000/24]
WO1997US22871
Priority number, dateUS1996076874217.12.1996         Original published format: US 768742
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9827409
Date:25.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007913
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2002
ClassificationInternational:G01F23/26, G05D9/12, G01N35/10, G01N1/10
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FESTSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEIT-SONDEN-KONTAKTES[2000/24]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING LIQUID-PROBE CONTACT[2000/24]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER UN CONTACT LIQUIDE-SONDE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase19.07.1999National basic fee paid 
19.07.1999Search fee paid 
19.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
24.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2007/35]
12.04.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2007/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200105   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2002
31.12.200610   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]US5212992  (CALHOUN JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 1, line 15 - line 57 * * column 7, line 15 - line 54; figures 1,6 *
International search[X]US5493922  (RAMEY B EDWARD [US], et al);
 [X]US5049826  (SASAO ITSURO [JP]);
 [Y]US4912976  (LABRIOLA II DONALD P [US]);
 [Y]US5178019  (KEITER DEAN [US]);
 [A]US5365783  (ZWEIFEL RONALD A [US]);
 [A]US5354537  (MORENO MARIO [US]);
 [A]US5275951  (CHOW HERBERT S [US], et al);
 [A]US5236666  (HULETTE WILLIAM C [US], et al);
 [A]US4736638  (OKAWA DOBSON [US], et al);
 [A]US4559507  (RAMSDALE KURT A [US], et al);
 [A]US4380091  (LIVELY OLIN A [US]);
 [A]US4173893  (HEDRICK GEOFFREY S [US])