Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007114

EP1007114 - BLUNT TIP CANNULA WITH ACCESS PIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.04.2005
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOARD OF SUPERVISORS OF LOUISIANA STATE UNIVERSITY AND AGRICULTURAL AND MECHANICAL COLLEGE
c/o Louisiana State University System P.O. Box 16070
Baton Rouge, LA 70893 / US
For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Schwertstrasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
[N/P]
Former [2004/26]For all designated states
Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
c/o Louisiana State University System P.O. Box 16070
Baton Rouge, LA 70893 / US
For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Schwertstrasse 9
8201 Schaffhausen / CH
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Board of Supervisors of Louisiana State University and Agricultural and Mechanical College
c/o Louisiana State University System P.O. Box 16070
Baton Rouge, LA 70893 / US
For all designated states
Sherwood Services AG
Schwertstrasse 9
8200 Schaffhausen / CH
Inventor(s)01 / KEMPEN, Paul, Martin
129 Gordon street
Pittsburgh, PA 15218-1605 / US
02 / KERWIN, Michael, J.
11108 Fairborough Court
St. Louis, MO 63146 / US
03 / RANFORD, Alan, B.
40 Patterson Court
Creve Coeur, MO 63146 / US
04 / TALONN, Daniel, A.
8661 Barby Lane
University City, MO 63124 / US
05 / FISER, Richard, L.
414 North Van Buren
Kirkwood, MO 63122 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London
SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Chettle, Adrian John , et al
Withers & Rogers, Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date97952490.716.12.1997
[2000/24]
WO1997US23279
Priority number, dateUS19960032716P16.12.1996         Original published format: US 32716 P
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826819
Date:25.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007114
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007114
Date:23.06.2004
Language:EN
[2004/26]
Search report(s)International search reportUS25.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP04.07.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61M5/00, A61M39/04, A61J1/00
[2000/33]
Former International [2000/24]A61M5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:KANÜLE MIT STUMPFEN ENDE UND ZUGANGSZAPFEN[2000/24]
English:BLUNT TIP CANNULA WITH ACCESS PIN[2000/24]
French:CANULE A EXTREMITES EMOUSSEES A POINTE D'ACCES[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase18.06.1999National basic fee paid 
18.06.1999Search fee paid 
18.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
18.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/24]
11.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2004Fee for grant paid
26.03.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.03.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
NL23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
PT23.11.2004
[2008/08]
Former [2006/13]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
NL23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/22]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
DK23.09.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/14]AT23.06.2004
BE23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/11]AT23.06.2004
CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/06]CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
GR23.09.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2005/02]CH23.06.2004
FI23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/52]CH23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
SE23.09.2004
Former [2004/51]CH23.06.2004
LI23.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[XA]US5382241  (CHOUDHURY HRISHIKESH [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 3, line 36 - line 44 * * column 4, line 42 - line 48 * * column 5, line 11 - line 17 * * column 5, line 52 - line 55 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-4,6,10
International search[Y]US5520657  (SELLERS JACKIE [US], et al);
 [Y]US3650393  (REISS ROBERT EDWARD, et al);
 [Y]US5529189  (FELDSCHUH JOSEPH [US]);
 [X]US4543101  (CROUCH ROBERT C [US]);
 [Y]US5403283  (LUTHER RONALD B [US])