Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968007

EP0968007 - ADHESIVE FOR SECURE TOPICAL ATTACHMENT TO THE SKIN AND COMFORTABLE REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.03.2008
Database last updated on 15.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/18]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CINELLI, Fabio
Via Duccio da Boninsegna, 8
I-40133 Bologna / IT
02 / COLES, Peter
Contrada Villa Nesi, 56
I-66023 Francavilla al Mare / IT
03 / CORZANI, Italo
Via Fonte Vecchia, 40
I-66100 Chieti / IT
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A.
Italian Research Center
Via Aterno 128-130
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/50]Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno, 128 Sambuceto
66020 S. Giovanni Teatino (CH) / IT
Former [2008/34]Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Via Aterno 128-130
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2007/17]Briatore, Andrea , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128-130
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2006/43]Boon, Graham Anthony , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2005/45]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 128/130
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2003/41]Engisch, Gautier , et al
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, 100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2002/01]Veronese, Pancrazio , et al
Procter & Gamble Italia S.p.A. Italian Research Center Via Aterno 92/94
66020 Sambuceto di San Giovanni Teatino (Chieti) / IT
Former [2000/01]Kohol, Sonia , et al
Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date97952544.122.12.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US23474
Priority number, dateEP1996012073823.12.1996         Original published format: EP 96120738
EP1997011073001.07.1997         Original published format: EP 97110730
EP1997012033620.11.1997         Original published format: EP 97120336
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9828021
Date:02.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968007
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968007
Date:02.05.2007
Language:EN
[2007/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61L15/58, C09J133/08, C09J129/04, C09J139/06, C09J153/02
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:LOKAL ANWENDBARES ADHÄSIV FÜR DIE HAUT UND BEQUEME ENTFERNUNG[2000/01]
English:ADHESIVE FOR SECURE TOPICAL ATTACHMENT TO THE SKIN AND COMFORTABLE REMOVAL[2000/01]
French:ADHESIF POUR FIXATION SOLIDE SUR LA PEAU, A RETRAIT AGREABLE[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase05.07.1999National basic fee paid 
05.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
31.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
10.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.02.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2006Date of oral proceedings
01.12.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.12.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.2007Fee for grant paid
15.03.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.02.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.05.2007
BE02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
LU22.12.2007
IE24.12.2007
[2010/05]
Former [2008/48]AT02.05.2007
BE02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
IE24.12.2007
Former [2008/21]AT02.05.2007
BE02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
GR03.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
Former [2008/12]AT02.05.2007
BE02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
PT02.10.2007
Former [2008/08]AT02.05.2007
BE02.05.2007
CH02.05.2007
DK02.05.2007
FI02.05.2007
LI02.05.2007
SE02.08.2007
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9310201  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1,5,6,9 * page 2, line 27 - line 38 * * page 4, line 31 - line 41 * * page 7, line 1 - page 9, line 27 *;
 [X]FR2734574  (PACIFIC CORP [KR]) [X] 1,5,6,8,9 * page 4, line 21 - page 6, line 26 * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 9 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]US5559165  (PAUL CHARLES W [US]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 1, line 21 - line 35 * * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 40 * * column 4, line 64 - line 66 * * example -; claim - *;
 [X]GB2115431  (VALLEYLAB INC) [X] 5,6,9 * page 4, line 55 - page 5, line 14 * * page 5, line 47 - page 7, line 13 * * page 10, line 6 - line 28 * * page 11, line 10 - line 19 *;
 [X]EP0184470  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [X] 5,6,9 * page 3, line 10 - line 19 * * page 3, line 34 - page 5, line 7 *;
 [X]JPS5592306  ;
 [X]JPS62209008  ;
 [Y]WO9614822  (OSMOTICS CORP [US]) [Y] 1,5-9 * page 9, line 13 - line 28 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 23 *;
 [YD]WO9613238  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [YD] 1,5-9 * page 7, line 11 - page 10, line 6 * * page 2, line 15 - line 35 * * examples 1-4; claim - *;
 [A]US5071704  (FISCHEL-GHODSIAN FARIBA [US]) [A] 1,9 * column 3, line 33 - line 40 * * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 42 *;
 [A]DE1934710  (SMITH & NEPHEW) [A] 9 * page 5, paragraph 5 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801011), vol. 004, no. 144, Database accession no. (C - 027), & JP55092306 A 19800712 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6,9 * abstract *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880304), vol. 012, no. 070, Database accession no. (C - 479), & JP62209008 A 19870914 (NIKKO KEMIKARUZU KK;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,5,6,9 * abstract *