EP0944510 - METHOD FOR BUBBLE-FREE FILLING OF BRAKE FLUID INTO A HYDRAULIC MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG Guerickestrasse 7 60488 Frankfurt / DE | [1999/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAECHLE, Martin Am Rech 1 D-61479 Glashütten / DE | 02 /
SCHMITT, Stefan, A. Untere Sattelhecke 27 D-63867 Johannesberg / DE | [1999/39] | Application number, filing date | 97952886.6 | 05.12.1997 | [1999/39] | WO1997EP06808 | Priority number, date | DE1996154087 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19654087 | [1999/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9828173 | Date: | 02.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0944510 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0944510 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/34 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
B60T8/34 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1999/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BLASENFREIEN BEFÜLLUNG EINER HYDRAULISCHEN KRAFTFAHRZEUGBREMSANLAGE MIT BREMSFLÜSSIGKEIT | [1999/39] | English: | METHOD FOR BUBBLE-FREE FILLING OF BRAKE FLUID INTO A HYDRAULIC MOTOR VEHICLE BRAKING SYSTEM | [1999/39] | French: | PROCEDE POUR REMPLIR SANS BULLE UNE UNITE DE FREINAGE HYDRAULIQUE DE VEHICULE A MOTEUR, AVEC UN LIQUIDE DE FREIN | [1999/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.07.1999 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/39] | 17.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 04.09.2002 | GB | 04.09.2002 | ES | 28.03.2003 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/21] | GB | 04.09.2002 | |
ES | 28.03.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | ES | 28.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0543187 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 40 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 15 * * column 7, line 35 - line 43; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0275351 (FROESCHMANN ERASMUS) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 16 - line 17 * * page 2, line 38 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0323889 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - line 39 * * column 4, line 33 - line 54 *; | [A]DE3806840 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 19 *; | [AD]DE4337133 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * abstract * * column 1, line 6 - line 47; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0482367 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 8 - line 37 * * column 2, line 46 - line 52; figure . *; | [A]JPH07165046 ; | [PX]DE19602219 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [PX] 1,2 * column 1, line 6 - column 2, line 17; figure .; claim 5 * * column 2, line 36 - line 43 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 095, no. 009, & JP07165046 A 19950627 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4337133 |