Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973578

EP0973578 - ASYMMETRIC MULTIPLE ELECTRODE SUPPORT STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.08.2001
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.10.2001 [2001/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EP TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
2710 Orchard Parkway
San Jose, California 95134 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
EP Technologies, Inc.
2710 Orchard Parkway
San Jose, California 95134 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SWANSON, David, K.
877 Heatherstone Way
Mountain View, CA 94040 / US
02 / WHAYNE, James, G.
17930 Los Felice Road
Saratoga, CA 94070 / US
03 / KORDIS, Thomas, F.
796 Crestmoore Drive
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
04 / PANESCU, Dorin
382 North Fair Oaks Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Grillparzerstrasse 14
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Postfach 22 14 43
80504 München / DE
Former [2000/04]Viering, Jentschura & Partner
Essener Strasse 5
46047 Oberhausen / DE
Application number, filing date97953030.027.10.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997US19372
Priority number, dateUS1996074256928.10.1996         Original published format: US 742569
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9818520
Date:07.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/18]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973578
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/05, A61N1/40, A61N1/20
[2000/04]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:TRÄGER FÜR MEHRFACH-ELEKTRODEN IN ASSYMETRISCHER BAUFORM[2000/04]
English:ASYMMETRIC MULTIPLE ELECTRODE SUPPORT STRUCTURES[2000/04]
French:STRUCTURES ASYMETRIQUES DE SUPPORT D'ELECTRODES MULTIPLES[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase27.05.1999National basic fee paid 
27.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
27.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDecision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: No
18.05.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
09.06.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
28.07.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.08.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.03.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/40]
02.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9412098  (CARDIAC PATHWAYS CORP [US]) [A] 1,7-12 * page 4, line 5 - page 12, line 10; figure - *;
 [A]WO9421168  (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1,7-12 * page 10, line 34 - page 14, line 8 * * page 17, line 9 - page 18, line 3 * * page 2, line 12 - page 23, line 32; figure - *;
 [A]WO9625094  (EP TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [A] 1,7-12 * page 10, line 2 - page 14, line 15; figure - *;
 [A]US5549108  (EDWARDS STUART D [US], et al) [A] 1,7-12 * column 3, line 42 - column 14, line 4; figure - *
by applicantUS5383874
 US19940206414
 US19960631575
 US19950557790
 US19940320301