Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0950302

EP0950302 - Public key cryptographic apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1999/42]PUBLIC KEY CRYPTOGRAPHIC APPARATUS AND METHOD
[2012/35]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.03.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 17.12.2014  [2014/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2013/19]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
20555 S.H. 249
Houston TX 77070 / US
Former [2004/36]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
20555 SH 249
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Former [2001/12]For all designated states
Compaq Computer Corporation
20555 SH 249
Houston, Texas 77070-2698 / US
Former [1999/42]For all designated states
TANDEM COMPUTERS INCORPORATED
10435 N. Tantau Avenue
Cupertino, California 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COLLINS, Thomas
14890 Baranza Lane
Saratoga, CA 95075 / US
02 / HOPKINS, Dale
2425 Ric Drive
Gilroy, CA 95020 / US
03 / LANGFORD, Susan
1275 Poplar Avenue 101
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
04 / SABIN, Michael
883 Mango Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US
[1999/42]
Representative(s)Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell
EIP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London, WC1V 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell
EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place
London, WC1V 6HU / GB
Former [2009/30]Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell
EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place
London, WC1V 6HU / GB
Former [2009/26]Lloyd, Richard Graham
Hewlett Packard CCF IP Section - Legal Department 5, Avenue Raymond Chanas-Eybens
38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2008/24]Lloyd, Richard Graham
HP Centre de Competences France IP Section, Legal Dept 5 av. Raymond Chanas
38053 Grenoble Cedex 09 / FR
Former [2001/17]Charig, Raymond Julian
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [1999/42]Ayers, Martyn Lewis Stanley , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date97953075.508.12.1997
[1999/42]
WO1997US22026
Priority number, dateUS19960033271P09.12.1996         Original published format: US 33271 P
US1997078445316.01.1997         Original published format: US 784453
[2000/32]
Former [1999/42]US19960003327P09.12.1996
US1997078445316.01.1997
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826536
Date:18.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0950302
Date:20.10.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[1999/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0950302
Date:08.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/19]
International and Supplementary
search report(s)
International search report -
published on:
US18.06.1998
Supplementary European search report -
dispatched on:
EP11.10.2004
ClassificationInternational:H04L9/30
[1999/42]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/42]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verschlüsselung unter Verwendung eines öffentlichen Schlüssels[2012/35]
English:Public key cryptographic apparatus and method[2012/35]
French:Appareil de cryptographie à clé publique et procédé correspondant[2012/35]
Former [1999/42]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERSCHLÜSSELUNG UNTER VERWENDUNG EINES ÖFFENTLICHEN SCHLÜSSELS
Former [1999/42]PUBLIC KEY CRYPTOGRAPHIC APPARATUS AND METHOD
Former [1999/42]APPAREIL DE CRYPTOGRAPHIE A CLE PUBLIQUE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT
Entry into regional phase22.06.1999National basic fee paid 
22.06.1999Search fee paid 
22.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/42]
21.01.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.10.2012Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.11.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2013Fee for grant paid
26.03.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2005
Opposition(s)11.02.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
24.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
24.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
26.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 16
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT08.05.2013
FR31.12.2013
[2014/51]
Former [2014/11]IT08.05.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US5351298  (SMITH PETER J [NZ]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 1 - column 3 * * column 13 *;
 [X]US4405829  (RIVEST RONALD L [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * column 4 - column 6 * * column 13, line 20 - line 34 *;
 [A]  BRUCE SCHNEIER, Applied Cryptography second Edition, USA, JOHN WILEY & SONS, XP002293138 [A] 1-16 * page 466 - page 474 *
International search[A]US4514592
 [A]US5046094
 [A]US5321752
 [A]US5351298
by applicant US4200770
  US4218582
  US4424414
    - BRUCE SCHNEIER: 'Applied Cryptography', 01 January 1996, JOHN WILEY & SONS, USA
    - BRUCE SCHNEIER: 'Applied Cryptography', 01 January 1996, JOHN WILEY & SONS