blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Owing to technical maintenance work online services of the EPO will be temporarily unavailable on Sunday, 4 September 2016, between at least 05.30 and 09.30 CET. We apologise for any inconvenience.

31.08.2016

More...
blank News flashes

Spain joins the Federated European Patent Register

Click here for more information on the Federated European Patent Register.

05.09.2016

More...
blank Related links

All documents: EP0950302  


Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 348
14.03.2014 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
08.05.2013 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
11.04.2013 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
26.03.2013 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
26.03.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.11.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.11.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.11.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 26
09.11.2012 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
26.10.2012 Description Search / examination 5
26.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.10.2012 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
02.08.2012 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
02.08.2012 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
02.08.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
02.08.2012 Text intended for grant Search / examination 24
15.07.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
15.07.2009 Claims Search / examination 5
15.07.2009 Description Search / examination 1
15.07.2009 Description Search / examination 1
15.07.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.06.2009 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
18.06.2009 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
29.05.2009 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.05.2009 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
20.05.2009 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 2
20.05.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.05.2009 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
26.03.2009 Invitation to file an authorisation Search / examination 1
05.03.2009 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
16.01.2009 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
16.01.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.08.2008 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
14.05.2008 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 1
14.05.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2008 Request for change of representative Search / examination 1
04.01.2008 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
20.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
20.05.2005 Claims Search / examination 5
20.05.2005 Description Search / examination 2
20.05.2005 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.2005 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
21.01.2005 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
21.01.2005 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
19.10.2004 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
13.10.2004 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
11.10.2004 Annex to European Search report Search / examination 1
11.10.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
11.10.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
20.07.2004 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
29.06.2004 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 10
12.02.2001 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.02.2001 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
11.01.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 8
19.05.2000 Priority document Search / examination 73
19.05.2000 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 2
08.09.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
22.06.1999 Claims Search / examination 3
22.06.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
22.06.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
05.11.1998 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 4
09.09.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
18.06.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
18.06.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 32
18.06.1998 Priority document Search / examination 34