Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0945046

EP0945046 - IMPROVED IMMERSION HEATING ELEMENT WITH HIGHLY THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYMERIC COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.12.2007
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENERGY CONVERTORS, INC.
Lower Demunds Road
Dallas, PA 18612 / US
For all designated states
RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY
500 Northpark Town Center 1100 Abernathy Road, N. E. Suite 1400
Atlanta, GA 30328 / US
[2007/07]
Former [1999/39]For all designated states
ENERGY CONVERTORS, INC.
Lower Demunds Road
Dallas, PA 18612 / US
For all designated states
RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY
405 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10174-0303 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ECKMAN, Charles, M.
11 Rice Drive
Dallas, PA 18612 / US
02 / RODEN, James, S.
141 Tensaw Road
Montgomery, AL 36117 / US
03 / HOCHBERG, Arie
39 Porter Place
Montclair, NJ 07042 / US
[1999/49]
Former [1999/39]01 / ECKMAN, Charles, M.
11 Rice Drive
Dallas, PA 18612 / US
02 / RODEN, James, S.
141 Tensaw Road
Montgomery, AL 36117 / US
03 / HOCHBERG, Arie
303 Strathmore Road
Rosemont, PA 19101 / US
Representative(s)Hafner, Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dr. D. Hafner
Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Hafner, Dieter , et al
Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. D. Hafner Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2005/27]Hafner, Dieter, Dr. , et al
Hafner & Partner GbR Patent-/Rechtsanwälte Schleiermacherstrasse 25
90491 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1999/39]Hafner, Dieter, Dr. Dipl.-Phys.
Ostendstrasse 132
90482 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date97953245.402.12.1997
[1999/39]
WO1997US23166
Priority number, dateUS1996076715616.12.1996         Original published format: US 767156
[1999/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9827789
Date:25.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0945046
Date:29.09.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[1999/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0945046
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US25.06.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2001
ClassificationInternational:H05B3/40, H05B3/82, H05B3/42
[2001/13]
Former International [1999/39]H05B3/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/39]
TitleGerman:VERBESSERTER TAUCHHEIZKÖRPER MIT EINER POLYMERBESCHICHTUNG MIT HOHER THERMISCHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT[2006/32]
English:IMPROVED IMMERSION HEATING ELEMENT WITH HIGHLY THERMALLY CONDUCTIVE POLYMERIC COATING[1999/39]
French:ELEMENT CHAUFFANT IMMERGEABLE AMELIORE REVETU D'UN ENDUIT POLYMERE A HAUTE CONDUCTIVITE THERMIQUE[1999/39]
Former [1999/39]VERBESSERTES TAUCHHEIZKÖRPER MIT EINEM POLYMER BESCHICHTUNG MIT HÖHER THERMISCHER LEITFÄHIGKEIT
Entry into regional phase01.07.1999National basic fee paid 
01.07.1999Search fee paid 
01.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
01.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/39]
30.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
18.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2006Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2006
23.03.2006Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
24.03.2006Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.08.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.12.2006Fee for grant paid
04.12.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.11.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2008/04]
Request for further processing for:16.01.2004Request for further processing filed
16.01.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.02.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[YA]DE3836387  (NORTON PAMPUS GMBH) [Y] 1,6,24 * see the whole document * [A] 3-6,10-12,15,19,22,23;
 [Y]FR2517918  (BONET ANDRE [FR]) [Y] 1,6,24 * page 19, lines 23-30 * * page 20, lines 26-38 * * page 21, lines 5-15 * * page 24, line 21 - page 25, line 5; figures 6,7,12 *;
 [A]GB2244898  (TOWNSEND DAVID WILLIAM) [A] 1,10,12,19,22 * page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure 1 *;
 [DA]US3943328  (CUNNINGHAM DONALD M) [DA] 1,10,12,19,22 * column 3, lines 12-26; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB1360334  (ANCIENS ETABS R BOUTIN SA DES) [A] 19 * column 2, lines 50-57 *
International search[Y]US2846536  (DRUGMAND LESTER D, et al);
 [Y]US5159659  (CAMERON GARY J [US]);
 [Y]US5305419  (CAMERON GARY J [US]);
 [Y]US4617456  (RICHARDS TOM [US], et al)