blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1002336

EP1002336 - N2O NITRIDED-OXIDE TRENCH SIDEWALLS TO PREVENT BORON OUTDIFFUSION AND DECREASE STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.2006
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
INTEL CORPORATION
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ARGHAVANI, Reza
7705 S.W. 194th Terrace
Aloha, OR 97007 / US
02 / CHAU, Robert, S.
13525 S.W. Harness Lane
Beaverton, OR 97008 / US
03 / YANG, Simon
16800 N.W. Waterford Way
Portland, OR 97229 / US
04 / GRAHAM, John
732 Cherokee Drive
Fort Collins, CO 80525 / US
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote
40- 43 Chancery Lane
London
WC2A 1JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/10]Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al
Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1JA / GB
Former [2001/36]Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al
Wildman, Harrold, Allen & Dixon 11th Floor, Tower 3, Clements Inn
London WC2A 2AZ / GB
Former [2000/21]Molyneaux, Martyn William
Langner Parry 52-54 High Holborn
London WC1V 6RR / GB
Application number, filing date97953276.916.12.1997
[2000/21]
WO1997US23307
Priority number, dateUS1996077557131.12.1996         Original published format: US 775571
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9829905
Date:09.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002336
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002336
Date:27.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.07.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01L21/762, H01L21/763, H01L21/3105
[2000/21]
CPC:
H01L21/31053 (EP,US); H01L21/76 (KR); H01L21/76235 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/21]
TitleGerman:TRENCH-SEITENWÄNDEN AUS N2O-NITRIERTEM OXID ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON BOR-AUSDIFFUSION UND ZUR STRESS-REDUZIERUNG[2005/10]
English:N2O NITRIDED-OXIDE TRENCH SIDEWALLS TO PREVENT BORON OUTDIFFUSION AND DECREASE STRESS[2000/21]
French:PAROIS LATERALES DE TRANCHEE A L'OXYDE NITRURE AU N2O FORMEES POUR EMPECHER LA SORTIE PAR DIFFUSION DE BORE ET REDUIRE LES CONTRAINTES[2000/21]
Former [2000/21]SEITENWÄNDEN AUS N2O-NITRIERTEM OXID ZUR VERHINDERUNG VON BOR-AUSDIFFUSION UND STRESS-REDUZIERUNG
Entry into regional phase28.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Search fee paid 
28.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/21]
18.05.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2005Fee for grant paid
17.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)28.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT27.07.2005
[2008/08]
Documents cited:Search[A]US5168343  (SAKAMOTO MITSURU [JP]) [A] 8 * column 3, line 24 - column 7, line 35 *;
 [AP]JPH08203884  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 8 * & US 5 616 401 A (KOBAYASHI MAIKO ET AL) 1 APRIL 1997 (1997-04-01);; examples 4,5 *[PA] ;
 [PX]WO9714175  (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [PX] 1,2,4-6,8 * page 10, paragraph 2 *
International search[A]US3976524  (FENG BAI-CWO);
 [A]US4871689  (BERGAMI BRIDGETTE A [US], et al);
 [A]US4960727  (MATTOX ROBERT [US], et al);
 [A]US5004703  (ZDEBEL PETER J [US], et al);
 [A]US5387540  (POON STEPHEN S [US], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.