Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1056505

EP1056505 - PERCUTANEOUS ACCESS DEVICE HAVING REMOVABLE TURRET ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.02.2005
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 20.02.2008  [2008/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
L. VAD TECHNOLOGY, INC.
300 River Place
Detroit, Michigan 48207 / US
[2000/49]
Inventor(s)01 / FREED, Paul, S.
1556 Lone Pine
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302 / US
02 / TARO, George
39810 Cheviot
Canton, MI 48188 / US
03 / KANTROWITZ, Adrian
70 Gallogly Road
Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US
[2000/49]
Representative(s)Spoor, Brian
Marks & Clerk 144 New Walk
Leicester LE1 7JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/23]Spoor, Brian
Lewis & Taylor 144 New Walk
Leicester LE1 7JA / GB
Former [2000/49]Arbousse-Bastide, Jean-Claude Philippe
Cabinet Maisonnier, 26, place Bellecour
69002 Lyon / FR
Application number, filing date97953505.122.12.1997
[2000/49]
WO1997US24064
Priority number, dateUS1997085690515.05.1997         Original published format: US 856905
[2000/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9851367
Date:19.11.1998
Language:EN
[1998/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1056505
Date:06.12.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998
[2000/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1056505
Date:31.03.2004
Language:EN
[2004/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.11.1998
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, A61M37/00
[2002/23]
Former International [2000/49]A61M37/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/49]
TitleGerman:PERKUTANE EINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG MIT ABNEHMBARER REVOLVERKOPFANORDNUNG[2000/49]
English:PERCUTANEOUS ACCESS DEVICE HAVING REMOVABLE TURRET ASSEMBLY[2000/49]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ACCES PERCUTANE A TOURELLE DEMONTABLE[2000/49]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2000National basic fee paid 
18.09.2000Search fee paid 
18.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
18.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/49]
05.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2003Fee for grant paid
21.11.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)04.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
24.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
16.08.2000AT   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000BE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000CH   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000DK   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000FI   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000GR   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000LU   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000MC   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000NL   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000PT   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
16.08.2000SE   M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
16.08.2000M01   Fee paid on   18.09.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199903   M06   Fee paid on   28.04.2000
31.12.200004   M06   Fee paid on   28.06.2001
31.12.200105   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
FR31.03.2004
IT31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
PT31.08.2004
GB22.12.2004
IE22.12.2004
LU22.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
[2008/08]
Former [2007/17]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
FR31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
GB22.12.2004
IE22.12.2004
LU22.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/14]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
FR31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
GB22.12.2004
IE22.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2006/13]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
NL31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
GB22.12.2004
IE22.12.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/45]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
MC31.12.2004
Former [2005/18]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
DK30.06.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/14]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
DE01.07.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/02]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
ES12.07.2004
Former [2005/01]AT31.03.2004
BE31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/51]AT31.03.2004
CH31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
LI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/43]AT31.03.2004
FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/41]FI31.03.2004
GR30.06.2004
SE30.06.2004
Former [2004/40]FI31.03.2004
SE30.06.2004
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2571260  (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED) [X] 1,5,14,19 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US5604976  (STOBIE JOHN J ET AL) [X] 19,20 * figure 17 *;
 [X]US4790826  (ELFTMAN NANCY W) [X] 19 * figures 1,4 *;
 [X]US5098397  (SVENSSON JAN A ET AL) [X] 19 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US3964470  (TROMBLEY MICHAEL A) [X] 19 * figure 4 *;
 [A]US3452366  (DOWNEY WOLCOTT M) [A] 1,5-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4581020  (MITTLEMAN HERBERT) [A] 1,5-23 * the whole document *
International search[X]US4804369  (LAPEYRE DIDIER M [FR], et al)
by applicantUS4634422
 US4051840