Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0992009

EP0992009 - MODELING GEOLOGICAL STRUCTURES AND PROPERTIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.06.2012
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.06.2012Refusal of applicationpublished on 18.07.2012  [2012/29]
Applicant(s)For:DE  GB  NL 
Schlumberger Holdings Limited
P.O. Box 71
Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:FR 
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger
42, rue Saint Dominique
75007 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]For:DE  GB  NL 
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED
P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers
Road Town, Tortola / VG
For:FR 
SERVICES PETROLIERS SCHLUMBERGER
42, rue Saint-Dominique
F-75007 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / ASSA, Steven, B.
8 The Crescent,Storeys Way
Cambridge CB30AZ / GB
02 / CELNIKER, George, W.
13114 Travis View Loop
Austin, TX 78732 / US
03 / ENDRES, David, M.
15119 Honeycomb Hollow
Leander, TX 78641 / US
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Suckling, Andrew Michael
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House The Oxford Science Park
Heatley Road
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Suckling, Andrew Michael
Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford
Oxfordshire OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2008/07]Suckling, Andrew Michael
Marks & Clerk, Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Former [2000/15]Stoole, Brian David
Geco-Prakla Technical Services Inc, Patent Department, Schlumberger House, Buckingham Gate
Gatwick, West Sussex RH6 0NZ / GB
Application number, filing date97953591.118.12.1997
[2000/15]
WO1997US24278
Priority number, dateUS1996077208219.12.1996         Original published format: US 772082
[2000/15]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9827498
Date:25.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0992009
Date:12.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.1998
[2000/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/15]
TitleGerman:MODELLIERUNG VON GEOLOGISCHEN STRUKTUREN UND EIGENSCHAFTEN[2000/15]
English:MODELING GEOLOGICAL STRUCTURES AND PROPERTIES[2000/15]
French:MODELISATION DE STRUCTURES ET PROPRIETES GEOLOGIQUES[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase07.06.1999National basic fee paid 
07.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/15]
27.08.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.02.2012Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/29]
01.02.2012Date of oral proceedings
29.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/29]
29.02.2012Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.08.2007
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.04.2008Request for further processing filed
29.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
13.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 13
15.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 14
12.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 15
Cited inInternational search[X]  - JONES C B, "Data structures for three-dimensional spatial information systems in geology", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF GEOGRAPHICAL INFORMATION SYSTEMS, JAN.-MARCH 1989, UK, ISSN 0269-3798, vol. 3, no. 1, pages 15 - 31, XP002064461 [X] 1,6,10,13,20,23,25-28,33,37,40,50-55,60,64,67,74,77,79-81 * page 25, paragraph 6 - page 29 *
 [X]  - BODE T ET AL, "First experiences with GEOSTORE, an information system for geologically defined geometries", IGIS '94: GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SYSTEMS. INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ADVANCED RESEARCH IN GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SYSTEMS. PROCEEDINGS, PROCEEDINGS OF IGIS'94. INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON ADVANCED RESEARCH IN GEOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SYSTEMS, ASCONA, SWITZ, ISBN 3-540-58795-0, 1994, BERLIN, GERMANY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, GERMANY, pages 35 - 44, XP002064462 [X] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HAZEM M. RAAFAT, "An extended relational database for remotely sensed image data management within GIS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING., NEW YORK US, (199107), vol. 29, no. 4, pages 651 - 655, XP000258538 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/36.135827