Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015959

EP1015959 - DEVICE FOR CONTROL OF ROOMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.11.2002  [2002/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Twosuns Media Development GmbH
Boxhagener Strasse 18
10245 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Günther, Detlef
Ohlauer Strasse 36
10999 Berlin / DE
For all designated states
Bohn, Andreas
Reichenberger Strasse 29
10999 Berlin / DE
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / GÜNTHER, Detlef
Ohlauer Strasse 36
D-10999 Berlin / DE
02 / BOHN, Andreas
Reichenberger Strasse 29
D-10999 Berlin / DE
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Müller, Wolfram Hubertus , et al
Patentanwälte
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Müller, Wolfram Hubertus, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date97953648.915.12.1997
[2000/27]
WO1997DE02969
Priority number, dateDE199615368213.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19653682
[2000/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9826345
Date:18.06.1998
Language:DE
[1998/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015959
Date:05.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1998
[2000/27]
Search report(s)International search reportEP18.06.1998
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/00, G10H1/00
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT [2000/27]
TitleGerman:RAUMSTEUERUNG[2000/27]
English:DEVICE FOR CONTROL OF ROOMS[2000/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR LOCAUX[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1999National basic fee paid 
02.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/27]
28.05.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
17.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
20.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/45]
31.05.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
02.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200004   M06   Fee paid on   02.07.2001
31.12.200105   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US5107746  (BAUER WILL [CA]) [A] 1-3,17-21 * column A * * column 3, line 19 - line 46 * * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 38 *;
 [A]WO8702168  (SIGALOV HAGAI) [A] 1-3,17-21 * abstract * * page 26, line 10 - line 16 *;
 [A]WO9630856  (PERCEPTION SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1,2,17-21 * abstract * * page 3, line 21 - page 4, line 5 * * page 17, line 20 - page 18, line 14; figure 7 *;
 [A]US5534917  (MACDOUGALL FRANCIS [CA]) [A] 1,2,6,17-21 * abstract * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 51 * * column 12, line 42 - column 14, line 48 *;
 [DA]US5326028  (KANO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-3,17-21 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - line 50 * * column 8, line 21 - line 39 * * column 12, line 34 - line 47 *;
 [A]US5372545  (NODA ETSUJI [JP], et al) [A] 1,17-21 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - column 6, line 32; figures 3,4,10 *