Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025428

EP1025428 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MICRO PARTICLE POSITIONING IN FIELD CAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 25.04.2007  [2007/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Evotec OAI AG
Schnackenburgallee 114
22525 Hamburg / DE
[2002/01]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
Evotec BioSystems AG
Schnackenburgallee 114
22525 Hamburg / DE
Former [2000/32]For all designated states
Evotec BioSystems GmbH
Schnackenburgallee 114
22525 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / FUHR, Günter
Kavalierstrasse 15
D-13187 Berlin / DE
[2000/32]
Representative(s)Hertz, Oliver , et al
v. Bezold & Partner
Patentanwälte - PartG mbB
Akademiestrasse 7
80799 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/32]Hertz, Oliver, Dr. , et al
v. Bezold & Sozien, Brienner Strasse 52
80333 München / DE
Application number, filing date97953804.812.12.1997
[2000/32]
WO1997EP07001
Priority number, dateDE199615366120.12.1996         Original published format: DE 19653661
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9828604
Date:02.07.1998
Language:DE
[1998/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1025428
Date:09.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.1998
[2000/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1025428
Date:11.09.2002
Language:DE
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.11.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N1/28
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/32]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MIKROPARTIKELPOSITIONIERUNG IN FELDKÄFIGEN[2000/32]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR MICRO PARTICLE POSITIONING IN FIELD CAGES[2000/32]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR POSITIONNER DES MICROPARTICULES DANS DES CAGES DE CHAMPS[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase02.06.1999National basic fee paid 
02.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/32]
31.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
12.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2002Fee for grant paid
17.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
DK11.12.2002
SE11.12.2002
AT12.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
[2007/17]
Former [2004/51]FI11.09.2002
FR11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
AT12.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
Former [2004/31]FI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
AT12.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
Former [2004/10]FI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
BE31.12.2002
Former [2003/22]FI11.09.2002
NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Former [2003/14]FI11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DE19500660  (FUHR GUENTER PROF DR [DE], et al) [A] 1,9;
 [A]DE4400955  (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1,9;
 [A]EP0453780  (IBM [US]) [A] 1,9