Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1003993

EP1003993 - SEAL CAP FOR GAS HOLDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.01.2002
Database last updated on 20.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 06.03.2002  [2002/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InfraServ GmbH & Co. Gendorf KG
84504 Burgkirchen / DE
[2000/22]
Inventor(s)01 / BACHMEIER, Franz
Schroffenerstrasse 9
D-84579 Unterneukirchen / DE
[2000/22]
Application number, filing date97953834.516.12.1997
[2000/22]
WO1997EP07067
Priority number, dateDE1997209989U09.06.1997         Original published format: DE 29709989 U
[2000/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9857096
Date:17.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1003993
Date:31.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998
[2000/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.12.1998
ClassificationInternational:F17C13/06, F17C13/12
[2000/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/22]
Extension statesAL10.01.2000
LT10.01.2000
LV10.01.2000
MK10.01.2000
RO10.01.2000
SI10.01.2000
TitleGerman:DICHTKAPPE FÜR GASBEHÄLTER[2000/22]
English:SEAL CAP FOR GAS HOLDERS[2000/22]
French:CAPOT ETANCHE POUR RECIPIENT CONTENANT DU GAZ[2000/22]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2000National basic fee paid 
10.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/22]
12.01.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
02.01.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US2465095  (HARVEY RAYMOND W);
 [A]US3323541  (SCHNEIDER JR THOMAS E, et al);
 [A]FR2067736  (KEMP NORMAN);
 [A]DE856746  (DIDIER KOGAG HINSELMANN KOKSOF, et al)