Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0967938

EP0967938 - ABRASIONPROOF TREATMENT FOR BREAST IMPLANTS AND RESULTING PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.10.2000
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.10.2000Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.12.2000 [2000/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lucciardi, Dominique
Villa Galli, Avenue Guy mocquet
83110 Sanary / FR
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Roman, Michel
Cabinet Roman
35, rue Paradis
B.P. 30064
13484 Marseille Cedex 20 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/01]Roman, Michel
CABINET ROMAN 35 rue Paradis, BP 2224
13207 Marseille Cédex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date97953986.331.12.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997FR02470
Priority number, dateFR1996001639531.12.1996         Original published format: FR 9616395
[2000/01]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9829056
Date:09.07.1998
Language:FR
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967938
Date:05.01.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998
[2000/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/12, A61L27/00
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2000/01]
TitleGerman:ABRASIONSBETÄNDIGE BEHANDLUNG VON IMPLANTIERBAREN BRUSTPROTHESEN[2000/01]
English:ABRASIONPROOF TREATMENT FOR BREAST IMPLANTS AND RESULTING PRODUCTS[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT ANTI-ABRASION POUR PROTHESES MAMMAIRES IMPLANTABLES ET PRODUITS AINSI OBTENUS[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase21.07.1999National basic fee paid 
21.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
01.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2000/50]
26.07.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2000/50]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.199903   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2707499  (NAVATEL PATRICE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2675049  (MAS JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [A] 1-7 * claim - *;
 [A]US5376117  (PINCHUK LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1 * claim - *;
 [DA]FR2677539  (MAS JEAN CLAUDE [FR]) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claim - *