blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0967945

EP0967945 - A THERMAL PACK HAVING A PLURALITY OF INDIVIDUAL HEAT CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2007
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/49]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAVIS, Leane, Kristine
705-1/2 Maple Ridge Drive
Milford, OH 45150 / US
02 / CRAMER, Ronald, Dean
86 Oliver Road
Cincinnati, OH 45216 / US
03 / OUELLETTE, William, Robert
11987 Blackhawk Circle
Cincinnati, OH 45240 / US
04 / KIMBLE, Dawn, Michele
10140 Crossing Drive
Sharonville, OH 45241 / US
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Patent Department
Rusham Park
Whitehall Lane, Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane Egham
Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2004/22]Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Rusham Park Whitehall Lane
Egham, Surrey TW20 9NW / GB
Former [2000/01]Clemo, Nicholas Graham, et al
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Patent Department Lovett House Lovett Road
Staines, Middlesex TW18 3AZ / GB
Application number, filing date97954157.017.12.1997
[2000/01]
WO1997US23412
Priority number, dateUS1996077785331.12.1996         Original published format: US 777853
US1997098400903.12.1997         Original published format: US 984009
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9829066
Date:09.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0967945
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0967945
Date:06.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.07.1998
ClassificationIPC:A61F7/03
[2000/01]
CPC:
A61F7/034 (EP); A61F2007/0098 (EP); A61F2007/0261 (EP);
A61F2007/0268 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:EINE THERMISCHE PACKUNG MIT MEHREREN EINZELNEN WÄRMEZELLEN[2000/01]
English:A THERMAL PACK HAVING A PLURALITY OF INDIVIDUAL HEAT CELLS[2000/01]
French:POCHETTE THERMIQUE COMPRENANT UNE PLURALITE DE CELLULES THERMIQUES INDIVIDUELLES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase01.07.1999National basic fee paid 
01.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
01.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
28.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.04.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.11.2004Fee for grant paid
16.11.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.09.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
07.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
04.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
LU17.12.2006
IE18.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
[2008/36]
Former [2008/21]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
IE18.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
GR07.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2008/08]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
DK06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
IE18.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
ES17.03.2007
PT07.05.2007
Former [2007/30]AT06.12.2006
BE06.12.2006
CH06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
LI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
Former [2007/29]AT06.12.2006
FI06.12.2006
NL06.12.2006
SE06.03.2007
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2602302  (POUX NOEL J) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, lines 7-30 * [A] 3;
 [YA]US3463161  (ANDRASSY STELLA) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, lines 33-40 * * column 4, line 73 - column 5, line 20 * [A] 3;
 [A]DE2742030  (REUFSTECK BARTHEL) [A] 9* page 4, paragraph 2 *;
 [A]FR2543669  (BLANIE PAUL [FR]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, lines 15-22 *;
 [A]DE3730039  (AMOENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * claims 1-4 *;
 [A]US5366491  (INGRAM AARON N [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, lines 10-32 *;
 [AP]WO9736968  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [AP] 1,3,6-8 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4366804
 USRE32026E
 US4649895
 US5046479
 JPH0581261B
    - A.R.GENNARO ET AL, "Oral Solid Dosage Forms", REMINGSTON'S PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1990), vol. 18, pages 1634 - 1656
    - MARILYN BAKKER, "Thermoforming", THE WILEY ENCYCLOPEDIA OF PACKAGING TECHNOLOGY, (1986), pages 668 - 675
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.