Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0973372

EP0973372 - VINEYARD APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR VINEYARD MECHANIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2006
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.11.2006  [2006/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS
2404 North University Avenue
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
The University of Arkansas
2404 North University Avenue
Little Rock, AR 72207-3608 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MORRIS, Justin, R.
1876 Albright Drive
Springdale, AR 72764 / US
02 / OLDRIDGE, Tommy, L.
1118 Concord Street
Lowell, AR 72745 / US
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Wood, Graham , et al
Bailey Walsh & Co LLP
1 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2006/28]Wood, Graham , et al
Bailey Walsh & Co L.L.P., 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD / GB
Former [2000/04]Denmark, James
Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place
Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB
Application number, filing date97954251.124.12.1997
[2000/04]
WO1997US23950
Priority number, dateUS19970035216P07.01.1997         Original published format: US 35216 P
US19970049285P10.06.1997         Original published format: US 49285 P
US1997095030114.10.1997         Original published format: US 950301
[2000/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9830078
Date:16.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0973372
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.1998
[2000/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.03.2005
ClassificationInternational:A01G17/00, A01D46/28, A01G17/02
[2005/02]
Former International [2000/04]A01G17/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/04]
TitleGerman:WEINBAUVORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND WEINBAUMECHANISIERUNGSVERFAHREN[2000/04]
English:VINEYARD APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD FOR VINEYARD MECHANIZATION[2000/04]
French:MATERIEL VITICOLE, ET SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE MECANISATION DE LA VITICULTURE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase22.07.1999National basic fee paid 
22.07.1999Search fee paid 
22.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
22.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
03.05.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/47]
09.06.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/47]
Divisional application(s)EP06006999.4  / EP1673970
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
26.01.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200307   M06   Fee paid on   26.01.2004
Documents cited:Search   [] - No further relevant documents disclosed,
International search[X]US5101618  (OLDRIDGE TOMMY L [US]);
 [XT]US5737908  (ANDELFINGER GEORGES [FR]);
 [X]US3371473  (BURTON CHARLES G);
 [A]US5515645  (GOBER GLENN D [US]);
 [A]US4703584  (CHAZALNOEL CLAUDE [FR]);
 [X]FR2723507  (BINGER FRANCE SARL [FR])
by applicantUS3426517
 US3439482
 US3473311
 US3563016
 US3559386
 US3601964
 US3613343
 US3715876