blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0970394 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0970394



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 346
23.03.2007 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
06.04.2006 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
22.02.2006 Approval of request for amendments/corrections Search / examination 1
16.02.2006 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 1
16.02.2006 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations Search / examination 2
13.02.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
13.02.2006 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.02.2006 French translation of claims Search / examination 7
13.02.2006 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
31.01.2006 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 2
24.01.2006 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
24.01.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
24.01.2006 Translation of priority document Search / examination 21
20.12.2005 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.10.2005 Invitation to file a translation of the previous application Search / examination 1
11.10.2005 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
11.10.2005 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
11.10.2005 Text intended for grant Search / examination 23
05.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 7
05.04.2004 Claims Search / examination 5
05.04.2004 Description Search / examination 7
05.04.2004 Description Search / examination 6
05.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
02.04.2004 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 31
03.12.2003 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
03.12.2003 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
30.05.2003 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
20.05.2003 Communication concerning signing of documents Search / examination 1
13.05.2003 Claims Search / examination 7
13.05.2003 Description Search / examination 8
13.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.05.2003 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 20
26.02.2003 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
19.02.2003 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
08.11.2002 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
08.11.2002 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
30.08.2001 Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document Search / examination 2
30.08.2001 Priority document Search / examination 60
30.08.2001 Transmission of a document (International preliminary examination report) Search / examination 2
10.03.2000 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
17.12.1999 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 4
17.12.1999 Priority document Search / examination 30
16.12.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 1
03.12.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
01.12.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 3
01.12.1999 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
26.11.1999 Invitation to pay fees for entry into European phase Search / examination 2
25.11.1999 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
23.07.1999 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.07.1999 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.06.1999 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.10.1998 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.07.1998 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
30.07.1998 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 28