blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0970394


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
28.11.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.12.2008  [2009/01]
18.01.2008 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2008  [2008/08]
23.03.2007 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
31.03.2006 (Expected) grant published on  17.05.2006  [2006/20]
21.02.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
21.02.2006 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
27.01.2006 Change - inventor published on  15.03.2006  [2006/11]
07.10.2005 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
07.10.2005 Change - designated states published on  23.11.2005  [2005/47]
05.10.2005 Change: Reply to examination report
27.09.2005 Change: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
23.09.2005 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
24.08.2005 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.08.2004 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.04.2004 New entry: Reply to examination report
29.11.2003 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.11.2003 Deletion: Reply to examination report
27.08.2003 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2003 Examination report or reply
21.02.2003 Examination report or reply
15.11.2002 First examination report
06.11.2002 Examination report or reply
23.09.2002 Loss of particular rights
30.08.2002 Renewal fee
23.08.2001 Renewal fee
25.08.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Loss of particular rights
13.12.1999 Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973)
26.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
26.11.1999 Request for examination filed published on  12.01.2000 [2000/02]
22.11.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
22.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.07.1999 Renewal fee
07.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
11.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
05.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
28.09.1998 PCT data prior to European publication