blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0970394
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3307654BGlobal Dossier 24.07.2002B2
JP2002502504 22.01.2002A
Priority number Date
KR9700147 01.08.1997
KR19970002393 28.01.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0970394Global Dossier 17.05.2006B1
EP0970394 12.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
KR9700147 01.08.1997
KR19970002393 28.01.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE69735896D 22.06.2006D1
Priority number Date
KR9700147 01.08.1997
KR19970002393 28.01.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6330117 11.12.2001B1
Priority number Date
KR9700147 01.08.1997
KR19970002393 28.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9833080Global Dossier 30.07.1998A1
Priority number Date
KR19970002393 28.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN1102746C 05.03.2003C
CN1244927 16.02.2000A
Priority number Date
KR19970002393 28.01.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR100207603B 15.07.1999B1
KR19980066701 15.10.1998A
Priority number Date
KR19970002393 28.01.1997