Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0970394

EP0970394 - OPTICAL ISOLATOR MODULE AND OPTICAL AMPLIFIER USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2007
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 31.12.2008  [2009/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong
Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-373 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2006/20]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-373 / KR
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu
Suwon City, Kyungki-do 442-373 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / SEO, Man, Soo
896-2 Daemyung 9-dong Nam-gu
Taegu / KR
 [2006/11]
Former [2000/02]01 / SEO, Man, Soo
4-203, Poonglim Apt. Wooman-dong Paldal-gu
Suwon-city Kyungki-do 442-190 / KR
Representative(s)Powell, Timothy John , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Powell, Timothy John , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date97954985.401.08.1997
[2000/02]
WO1997KR00147
Priority number, dateKR1997000239328.01.1997         Original published format: KR 9702393
[2000/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9833080
Date:30.07.1998
Language:EN
[1998/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0970394
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.07.1998
[2000/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0970394
Date:17.05.2006
Language:EN
[2006/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT30.07.1998
ClassificationInternational:G02B5/30, G02F1/09, H01S3/30, H01S3/06
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2005/47]
Former [2000/02]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:OPTISCHER MODULATOR UND OPTISCHER VERSTÄRKER UNTER VERWENDUNG DESSELBEN[2000/02]
English:OPTICAL ISOLATOR MODULE AND OPTICAL AMPLIFIER USING THE SAME[2000/02]
French:MODULE DE PHOTOCOUPLEUR ET AMPLIFICATEUR OPTIQUE DANS LEQUEL IL EST UTILISE[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase09.07.1999National basic fee paid 
09.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT
09.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
29.08.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.03.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
08.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.02.2006Fee for grant paid
10.02.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)20.02.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
12.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
12.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
20.12.1999AT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999CH   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999ES   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999IT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
20.12.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR17.05.2006
GB17.08.2006
DE18.08.2006
[2009/01]
Former [2008/08]GB17.08.2006
DE18.08.2006
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0661579  (AT & T CORP [US]);
 [A]FR2678075  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [A]US5315431  (MASUDA AKIHIRO [JP], et al);
 [A]US5245690  (AIDA KAZUO [JP], et al)